Buckosh v. Bonded Filter Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Debra Buckosh
Defendant: Steven MacWilliams, Lee Ann Shephard, Matthew Ashwood, Michael Massaro, Bonded Filter Company, LLC doing business as BFC Solutions, Avalt and Mark Verdi
Case Number: 1:2021cv00975
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Opposition to #5 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) filed by Debra Buckosh. (Attachments: #1 affidavit of debra bucks)(Gard, Stephen)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 6/21/21. case management conference to be held on 8/12/2021 at 10:00 AM by video conference (Cleveland) before Judge James S. Gwin. IMPORTANT The Court requires the attendance of 1. All named parties 2. Lead counsel 3. A representative with full settlement authority (Attachments: #1 1. Parties' Planning Meeting Report, #2 2. Local Rule 30.1)(S,KM)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Answer to Complaint filed by Matthew Ashwood, Bonded Filter Company, LLC, Steven MacWilliams, Michael Massaro, Lee Ann Shephard. (Wentz, Amy)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) filed by Matthew Ashwood, Steven MacWilliams, Michael Massaro, Lee Ann Shephard. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Declaration of Matthew Ashwood, #3 Declaration of Michael Massaro, #4 Declaration of Steven MacWilliams, #5 Declaration of Lee Ann Shephard)(Wentz, Amy)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/13/2021 granting Defendants' #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until June 17, 2021. (S,KM)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Motion for extension of time until June 17, 2021 to answer , plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Matthew Ashwood, Bonded Filter Company, LLC, Steven MacWilliams, Michael Massaro, Lee Ann Shephard. (FitzGerald, Brian)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Bonded Filter Company, LLC. (Wentz, Amy)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-21-945976 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-10826584. Filed by Lee Ann Shephard, Michael Massaro, Matthew Ashwood, Bonded Filter Company, LLC, Steven MacWilliams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons and Proof of Mailing, #3 Exhibit C - Docket, #4 Declaration of Steven MacWilliams, #5 Declaration of Lee Ann Shephard, #6 Declaration of Michael Massaro, #7 Civil Cover Sheet). (Wentz, Amy)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,MI)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (L,MI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckosh v. Bonded Filter Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven MacWilliams
Represented By: Amy Ryder Wentz
Represented By: Brian P. FitzGerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Ann Shephard
Represented By: Amy Ryder Wentz
Represented By: Brian P. FitzGerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Ashwood
Represented By: Amy Ryder Wentz
Represented By: Brian P. FitzGerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Massaro
Represented By: Amy Ryder Wentz
Represented By: Brian P. FitzGerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonded Filter Company, LLC doing business as BFC Solutions
Represented By: Amy Ryder Wentz
Represented By: Brian P. FitzGerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Verdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Buckosh
Represented By: Stephen W. Gard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?