Henry v. Hilton Management LLC
Plaintiff: Shavaugn Henry
Defendant: Hilton Management LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01046
Filed: May 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2661
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order - Case settled and dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 6/21/21. (P,R)
June 17, 2021 Filing 8 Initial Disclosures filed by All Defendants. (Verdi, James)
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Disclosures filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rodriguez, Angela)
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Hilton Management LLC. (Tersigni, Vincent)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 6/21/2021 at 01:00 PM to be held by video conference (Cleveland) before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting due no later than 12:00 p.m. on 6/17/2021. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 5/27/21. (W,CM)
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Hilton Management LLC. (Tersigni, Vincent)
May 20, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
May 20, 2021 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (L,MI)
May 20, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI)
May 19, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc. for Hilton Management LLC filed by Hilton Management LLC. (Tersigni, Vincent)
May 19, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV 21 946180 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-10842124. Filed by Hilton Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Tersigni, Vincent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Hilton Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Management LLC
Represented By: Vincent J. Tersigni
Represented By: James P. Verdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shavaugn Henry
Represented By: Angela L. Rodriguez
Represented By: Brian D. Spitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?