Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company v. Mann & Carducci Co., LPA, et al
Plaintiff: Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Robert J. Mann, Mann & Carducci Co., LPA, Mary Saphia-Carducci, Adrian Davis and Ed Bais
Case Number: 1:2021cv01082
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company. Adrian Davis waiver sent on 6/4/2021, answer due 8/3/2021 filed on behalf of Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company (Calderone, Kenneth)
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company. Ed Bais waiver sent on 6/4/2021, answer due 8/3/2021 filed on behalf of Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company (Calderone, Kenneth)
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company. Mann & Carducci Co., LPA waiver sent on 6/4/2021, answer due 8/3/2021 filed on behalf of Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company (Calderone, Kenneth)
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company. Robert J. Mann waiver sent on 6/4/2021, answer due 8/3/2021 filed on behalf of Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company (Calderone, Kenneth)
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company. Mary Saphia-Carducci on 6/4/2021, answer due 8/3/2021 filed on behalf of Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company (Calderone, Kenneth)
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, therefore not issued. (M,MT)
May 26, 2021 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (M,MT)
May 26, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (M,MT)
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand for Declaratory Judgment against all Defendants. Filing fee paid $402.00, Receipt number AOHNDC-10852281. Filed by Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Invoice - The Ohio Department of Transportation, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Calderone, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company v. Mann & Carducci Co., LPA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mann & Carducci Co., LPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Saphia-Carducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Bais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Frank G. Mazgaj
Represented By: Frank G. Mazgaj, Jr
Represented By: Kenneth A. Calderone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?