Colbert v. Cuyahoga County Board of Commissioners et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Colbert
Defendant: Chanda Zitiello, John Doe Maple Heights Officer, MetroHealth System, Cuyahoga County Board of Commissioners, Dr. Thomas Tallman, Andre Averyheart, Robert Head, John Doe Charge Nurse, John Doe Nurse Manager, Antonio Brunello, Armond Budish, Kenneth Mills, Eric J. Ivey, James Lee Johnson, John Does Cuyahoga County, SHJB3 Corrections Officer/Intake Screening, Officer John Hantak, Officer Derek Jividen, Barrington Brown, John Doe Floor Supervisor, John Doe Intake/Screening Nurse/Officer, John Doe Nurses and Earl Leiken
Case Number: 1:2021cv01161
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by R. Todd Hunt filed by on behalf of Kenneth Mills. (Hunt, R.)
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Andre Averyheart, Barrington Brown, Antonio Brunello, Armond Budish, Cuyahoga County Board of Commissioners, Robert Head, Eric J. Ivey, John Doe Intake/Screening Nurse/Officer, James Lee Johnson, Earl Leiken, Kenneth Mills, SHJB3 Corrections Officer/Intake Screening, Thomas Tallman, Chanda Zitiello. (S,AN)
July 27, 2021 Filing 9 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Daniel Colbert. (Attachments: #1 Summons Cuyahoga County/Cuyahoga County Bd. of Comm., #2 Summons Dr. Thomas Tallman, #3 Summons Earl Leiken, #4 Summons Ken Mills, #5 Summons James Lee Johnson, #6 Summons Robert Head, #7 Summons Andre Averyheart, #8 Summons Chanda Zitello, #9 Summons Armond Budish, #10 Summons Barrington Brown, #11 Summons Eric Ivey, #12 Summons Antonio Brunello, #13 Summons SHJB3 Corrections Officer/Intake/Screening, #14 Summons John Doe Intake/Screening Nurse/Officer)(Cristallo, Paul)
July 25, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR: Documents are blank. Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Daniel Colbert. (Attachments: #1 Summons Cuyahoga County/Cuyahoga County Bd. Of Comm., #2 Summons Dr. Thomas Tallman, #3 Summons Eric J. Ivey, #4 Summons Armond Budish, #5 Summons Kenneth Mills, #6 Summons Earl Leiken, #7 Summons James Lee Johnson, #8 Summons Robert Head, #9 Summons Andre Averyheart, #10 Summons Antonio Brunello, #11 Summons Chanda Zitello, #12 Summons Barrington Brown)(Cristallo, Paul) Modified on 7/26/2021 (S,AN).
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Complaint filed by John Hantak, Derek Jividen, John Doe Maple Heights Officer. Related document(s) #1 . (Consolo, Frank)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference on 8/18/2021 at 09:45 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 7/8/2021. (M,S)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 Motion to Quash Service of Process upon Defendant Barrington Brown and Motion to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Process and Service of Process with Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Barrington Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court Docket Entry, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Service Tab, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Kimberley Coleman, #5 Call Detroit Diesel Allison, Inc v. C & D Oil Co., #6 Royster v. Mohr)(Climer, James). Modified to add Motion to Dismiss on 7/15/2021 (S,AN).
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 Marginal Entry Order granting Defendant's #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Barrington Brown answer due 7/8/2021. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 6/16/2021. (M,S)
June 15, 2021 Filing 3 Motion for extension of time until July 8, 2021 to answer Move or Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint of Defendant filed by Defendant Barrington Brown. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James A. Climer)(Climer, James)
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas, case number CV 21 947395 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-10876522. Filed by Thomas Tallman, MetroHealth System, Chanda Zitiello. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Affidavit of Merit, #27 Judgment Entry #28 Notice of Appearance on behalf of John Hantak, Derek Jividen and John Doe Maple Heights Officer, #29 Joint Answer of Defendants Chanda Zitiello, Thomas Tallman, DO and MetroHealth System to Plaintiff's Complaint). (Groedel, Marc)
June 10, 2021 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (L,MI)
June 10, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colbert v. Cuyahoga County Board of Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chanda Zitiello
Represented By: Marc W. Groedel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Maple Heights Officer
Represented By: Frank Consolo
Represented By: Horace F. Consolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetroHealth System
Represented By: Marc W. Groedel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuyahoga County Board of Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Thomas Tallman
Represented By: Marc W. Groedel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Averyheart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Head
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Charge Nurse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Nurse Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Brunello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armond Budish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Mills
Represented By: Benjamin G. Chojnacki
Represented By: R. Todd Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric J. Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lee Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does Cuyahoga County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHJB3 Corrections Officer/Intake Screening
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John Hantak
Represented By: Frank Consolo
Represented By: Horace F. Consolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Derek Jividen
Represented By: Frank Consolo
Represented By: Horace F. Consolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrington Brown
Represented By: Brendan D. Healy
Represented By: James A. Climer
Represented By: Amily A. Imbrogno
Represented By: John D. Pinzone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Floor Supervisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Intake/Screening Nurse/Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Nurses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Leiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Colbert
Represented By: Paul J. Cristallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?