Lettuce Entertain You Enterprises, Inc. v. Summer House LLC
Plaintiff: Lettuce Entertain You Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Summer House LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01164
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Filing 13 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 8/31/2021 at 11:30 AM telephonically before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. Dial-in information will be issued separately. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 8/5/2021. (R,Sh)
August 2, 2021 Filing 12 Answer to Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages filed by Summer House LLC. (Flynn, J.)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting the Parties' #11 Stipulated Motion for extension of time until 8/5/2021 to answer Complaint. Summer House LLC answer due 8/5/2021.Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 7/1/2021.(R,Sh)
June 28, 2021 Filing 11 Stipulated Motion for extension of time until 8/5/2021 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant Summer House LLC. (Flynn, J.)
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 Return of Service by Email executed upon Defendant Summer House LLC on June 14, 2021 filed on behalf of Lettuce Entertain You Enterprises, Inc. Related document(s) #9 . (Hurst, Anne)
June 14, 2021 Filing 9 Original Summons issued for service upon Summer House LLC. (M,TL)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Kara C. Smith, Antony J. McShane for Lettuce Entertain You Enterprises, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #6 , #7 ). Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 6/11/2021.(R,Sh)
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 Motion for attorney Kara C. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10879062, filed by Plaintiff Lettuce Entertain You Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kara C. Smith and Certificate of Good Standing)(Hurst, Anne)
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 Motion for attorney Antony J. McShane to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10878987, filed by Plaintiff Lettuce Entertain You Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Antony McShane and Certificate of Good Standing)(Hurst, Anne)
June 10, 2021 Filing 5 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Lettuce Entertain You Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hurst, Anne)
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Lettuce Entertain You Enterprises, Inc.. (Hurst, Anne)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Lettuce Entertain You Enterprises, Inc.. (Hurst, Anne)
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons issued, therefore no summons provided. (L,Ja)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint for injunctive relief and damages with jury demand against Summer House LLC. Filing fee paid $ 402.00 Receipt number AOHNDC-10877019. Filed by Lettuce Entertain You Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - trademark) (Hurst, Anne)
June 10, 2021 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (L,Ja)
June 10, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,Ja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lettuce Entertain You Enterprises, Inc. v. Summer House LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summer House LLC
Represented By: J. Jaredd Flynn
Represented By: Leo M. Spellacy, Jr.
Represented By: Todd C. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lettuce Entertain You Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Anne E. Hurst
Represented By: Michael J. Garvin
Represented By: Antony J. McShane
Represented By: Kara C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?