Juul Labs, Inc. v. Shrey LLC
Plaintiff: Juul Labs, Inc.
Defendant: Shrey LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01189
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Filing 13 Report on the Determination [Closing] of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120). (Attachments: #1 Order)(W,Na)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order: Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Fed.Civ.R.P. 41(a)(1)(i) is So Ordered. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 7/14/21. (LC,S) re #11
July 14, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) With Prejudice filed by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Pierre-Louis, Lloyd)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 8/27/2021 at 08:45 AM to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 7/07/21. (D,Ma)
June 25, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Shrey LLC on 6/25/2021, filed on behalf of Shrey LLC. Related document(s) #8 . (S,AN)
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Shrey LLC. (S,AN)
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons upon Shrey LLC, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons upon Shrey LLC) (Pierre-Louis, Lloyd)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons upon Shrey LLC dba Mini Mart Express, filed by Juul Labs, Inc. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons Shrey LLC dba Mini Mart Express) Pierre-Louis, Lloyd). Summons not issued as Shrey LLC dba Mini Mart Express is not a party in this case. Modified on 6/23/2021 (S,AN).
June 23, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Shrey LLC placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7019 2280 0000 6438 1911. (S,AN)
June 15, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, and were not issued. (L,MI)
June 15, 2021 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. (L,MI)
June 15, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (L,MI)
June 15, 2021 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Juul Labs, Inc. (Pierre-Louis, Lloyd)
June 15, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Juul Labs, Inc. Related document(s) #1 . (Pierre-Louis, Lloyd)
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Altria Group, Inc. for Juul Labs, Inc. filed by Juul Labs, Inc. (Pierre-Louis, Lloyd)
June 15, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint for trademark infringement, false designation of origin, unfair competition, violation of Ohio common law, and violation of Ohio deceptive trade practices act. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10885064. Filed by Juul Labs, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Trademark, #2 Exhibit B - Product Purchased Image, #3 Exhibit C - Cease & Desist Correspondence, #4 Exhibit D - Product Purchased Image). (Pierre-Louis, Lloyd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juul Labs, Inc. v. Shrey LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shrey LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juul Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Lloyd Pierre-Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?