Murray v. Thomas, et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Murray
Defendant: John Does 1-10, City of Warrensville Heighs, Officer Jerome Thomas, Wesley Haynes, Chief Wesley Haynes, City of Warrenville Heights and John Does
Case Number: 1:2021cv01200
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order directing the parties to refile herein any motions that were previously filed in state court and which remained pending at the time of removal by no later than 8/4/2021. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 7/21/2021. (P,K)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held telephonically on 8/23/2021 at 01:30 PM. The Court will provide counsel, via email, instructions for accessing the conference call. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order and to familiarize themselves with the deadlines imposed as not all deadlines are contained in the text of this docket entry. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 7/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Standard)(P,K)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by City of Warrenville Heights, John Does, Wesley Haynes, Jerome Thomas. (Imbrogno, Amily)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 Motion for extension of time until July 14, 2021 to answer Move or Plead to Complaint filed by City of Warrenville Heights, John Does, Wesley Haynes, Jerome Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James A. Climer)(Climer, James)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #3 Defendants' Motion for extension of time until July 14, 2021 to answer Move or Plead to Complaint. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 6/22/2021.(P,K)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,MT)
June 17, 2021 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (M,MT)
June 17, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (M,MT)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County, case number CV-21-947606 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $402.00, receipt number AOHNDC-10887469. Filed by all Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons - City of Warrensville Heights, #3 Summons - Chief Wesley Haynes, #4 Summons - John Does, #5 Summons - Officer Jerome Thomas, #6 Summons - City of Warrensville Heights, #7 Summons - Chief Wesley Haynes, #8 Summons - John Does, #9 Summons - Officer Jerome Thomas, #10 Pleading Journal Entry, #11 Civil Cover Sheet) (Imbrogno, Amily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. Thomas, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Represented By: Amily A. Imbrogno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Warrensville Heighs
Represented By: Amily A. Imbrogno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jerome Thomas
Represented By: Amily A. Imbrogno
Represented By: James A. Climer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Haynes
Represented By: Amily A. Imbrogno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Wesley Haynes
Represented By: James A. Climer
Represented By: Amily A. Imbrogno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Warrenville Heights
Represented By: James A. Climer
Represented By: Amily A. Imbrogno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Represented By: James A. Climer
Represented By: Amily A. Imbrogno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Murray
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?