World Debt Acquisitions, LLC v. Arch Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: World Debt Acquisitions, LLC
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company, Specialty Insurance Company and Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv01297
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 10 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim , or in the alternative, Motion for more definite statement filed by Arch Insurance Company, Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Georgia Corporate Filing, #3 Exhibit C - Tax Card, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Page Limit)(Merical, Joseph) Modified text on 8/31/2021 (S,SR).
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Arch Insurance Company, Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Merical, Joseph)
August 4, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Arch Capital Group, Ltd., Other Affiliate Arch Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate Arch Insurance Company for Arch Specialty Insurance Company filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Merical, Joseph)
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Arch Capital Group Ltd., Corporate Parent Arch Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Arch Reinsurance Company for Arch Insurance Company filed by Arch Insurance Company. (Merical, Joseph)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Arch Specialty Insurance Company on 7/7/2021, filed on behalf of World Debt Acquisitions, LLC (Hunziker, Scott)
August 2, 2021 Notice by Clerk that Arch Insurance Company and Arch Specialty Insurance Company failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (S,SR)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 7/28/2021 granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until August 27, 2021. (S,KM)
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until August 27, 2021 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Arch Insurance Company, Specialty Insurance Company. Related document(s) #1 . (Merical, Joseph)
July 15, 2021 Filing 4 Proof of Service by personal service executed upon Arch Insurance Company on 7/7/2021, filed on behalf of World Debt Acquisitions, LLC (Hunziker, Scott)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 Proof of Service by personal service executed upon Specialty Insurance Company on 7/7/2021, filed on behalf of World Debt Acquisitions, LLC (Hunziker, Scott)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon all Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,MT)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against all Defendants. Filing fee paid $402.00, Receipt number AOHNDC-10916606. Filed by World Debt Acquisitions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Arch Insurance, #3 Summons - Specialty Insurance) (Hunziker, Scott)
July 6, 2021 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (M,MT)
July 6, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (M,MT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: World Debt Acquisitions, LLC v. Arch Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: World Debt Acquisitions, LLC
Represented By: Scott G. Hunziker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph Kendall Merical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph Kendall Merical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?