Jocke, et al v. City of Medina, Ohio
Plaintiff: Ralph E. Jocke, Patricia A. Walker and Keith A. Rasey
Defendant: City of Medina, Ohio
Case Number: 1:2021cv01310
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Walker, Patricia)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 9/7/2021 at 02:00 PM at to be held telephonically before Judge John R. Adams. Judge John R. Adams on August 2, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, #2 Local Civil Rule 30.1, #3 Consent to Magistrate, #4 Preliminary Budget, #5 Policies and Procedures Manual)(T,MK)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Tonya J. Rogers filed by on behalf of City of Medina, Ohio. (Rogers, Tonya)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 Answer to #1 Complaint filed by City of Medina, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supreme Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Supreme Court Opinion, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Exhibit Answer and Counterclaim, #5 Exhibit Counterdemand, #6 Exhibit Email Correspondence)(Rogers, Tonya)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon City of Medina, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,MT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2021: #2 Updated Summons) (M,MT). Modified on 7/15/2021 (M,MT).
July 7, 2021 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,MT)
July 7, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,MT)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against City of Medina, Ohio. Filing fee paid $402.00, Receipt number AOHNDC-10918181. Filed by all Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1 - Medina TV Denial, #4 Exhibit 2 - Screen of Facebook Post of PAC, #5 Exhibit 3 - City and County Responses to Walker, #6 Exhibit 4 - Medina City Political Literature, #7 Exhibit 5 - Email from City Employee, #8 Exhibit 6 - Reproduction of Medina Police Department Facebook Page, #9 Exhibit 7 - McTigue Invoice) (Walker, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jocke, et al v. City of Medina, Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Medina, Ohio
Represented By: Gregory A. Beck
Represented By: James F. Mathews
Represented By: Tonya J. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph E. Jocke
Represented By: Ralph E. Jocke
Represented By: Patricia A. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A. Walker
Represented By: Ralph E. Jocke
Represented By: Patricia A. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith A. Rasey
Represented By: Ralph E. Jocke
Represented By: Patricia A. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?