Bastock v. Board of Education of the Lorain City School District et al
Plaintiff: Rae Bastock
Defendant: Board of Education of the Lorain City School District, Gregory D. Ring and Mark Ballard
Case Number: 1:2021cv01434
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference on 10/12/2021 at 09:45 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 9/1/2021. (M,S)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Rae Bastock. Board of Education of the Lorain City School District waiver sent on 8/13/2021, answer due 10/12/2021 filed on behalf of Rae Bastock (Sobel, Sean)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Rae Bastock. Mark Ballard waiver sent on 8/13/2021, answer due 10/12/2021 filed on behalf of Rae Bastock (Sobel, Sean)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Rae Bastock. Gregory D. Ring waiver sent on 8/13/2021, answer due 10/12/2021 filed on behalf of Rae Bastock (Sobel, Sean)
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to Counsel for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,Ja)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402.00 Receipt number AOHNDC-10950194. Filed by Rae Bastock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Defendant Board of Education of the Lorain City School District, #3 Summons for Defendant Gregory D. Ring, #4 Summons for Defendant Mark Ballard) (Sobel, Sean)
July 26, 2021 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (L,Ja)
July 26, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,Ja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bastock v. Board of Education of the Lorain City School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rae Bastock
Represented By: Claire I. Wade-Kilts
Represented By: Sean H. Sobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of the Lorain City School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory D. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?