Bey v. Dingenary, et al
Plaintiff: eryca bey
Defendant: officer mark dingenary, Chief dalton preston, Village of Highland Hills and John Does
Case Number: 1:2021cv01443
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 11 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Local Rule 16.3(b) - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Eryca Bey. (Soldato, Peter)
September 21, 2021 Filing 10 Initial Disclosures of Defendants filed by Mark Dingenary, Dalton Preston, Village of Highland Hills. (Latchney, John)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 Initial Disclosures filed by Eryca Bey. (Soldato, Peter)
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Mark Dingenary, Dalton Preston, Village of Highland Hills. (Latchney, John)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 9/27/2021 at 11:15 AM to be held by video conference (Cleveland) before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting due no later than 12:00 p.m. on 9/23/2021. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/10/2021. (K,K)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' #6 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until August 20, 2021 to answer . Mark Dingenary answer due 8/20/2021; Dalton Preston answer due 8/20/2021; Village of Highland Hills answer due 8/20/2021. Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/9/2021.(K,K)
August 6, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until August 20, 2021 to answer filed by Defendant Mark Dingenary. Related document(s) #1 . (Latchney, John)
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Peter Soldato, Justin Abbarno, and Justin Hawal, filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Soldato, Peter)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 Supplement to Notice of Removal - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Mark Dingenary. Related document(s) #1 . (Latchney, John)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court, case number 21CV949322 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-10952413.. Filed by Mark Dingenary. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Removal) (Latchney, John)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,MT)
July 27, 2021 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (M,MT)
July 27, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (M,MT)
July 27, 2021 Request to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: erroneously filed second Notice of Removal. Receipt #: AOHNDC-10952413, filed by Mark Dingenary. (Latchney, John)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court, case number CV 21 949322 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $402.00, receipt number AOHNDC-10951888. Filed by Mark Dingenary, Dalton Preston, and Village of Highland Hills. (Latchney, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bey v. Dingenary, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: eryca bey
Represented By: Justin S. Abbarno
Represented By: Justin J. Hawal
Represented By: Peter Carmen Soldato
Represented By: Robert F. DiCello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: officer mark dingenary
Represented By: John D. Latchney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief dalton preston
Represented By: John D. Latchney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Highland Hills
Represented By: John D. Latchney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?