Noco Company v. Shenzhen Dingjiang Technology Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Defendant: Shenzhen Dingjiang Technology Co., Ltd. doing business as Topdon and USA Topdon, LLC doing business as Topdon
Case Number: 1:2021cv01483
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Richard S. Mandel for Shenzhen Dingjiang Technology Co., Ltd. and USA Topdon, LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #11 ) Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/1/2021.(K,K)
August 31, 2021 Filing 11 Motion for attorney Richard S. Mandel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11010245, filed by Shenzhen Dingjiang Technology Co., Ltd., USA Topdon, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Richard S. Mandel, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Schwallie, Halden)
August 31, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Shenzhen Dingjiang Technology Co., Ltd., USA Topdon, LLC. (Schwallie, Halden)
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Halden R. Schwallie and Michael N. Ungar, filed by on behalf of Shenzhen Dingjiang Technology Co., Ltd., USA Topdon, LLC. (Schwallie, Halden)
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Noco Company. Shenzhen Dingjiang Technology Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 8/19/2021, answer due 11/16/2021 filed on behalf of Noco Company (Welsh, Alexander)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order approving #6 Stipulation to allow Topdon USA and Topdon up to and including October 18, 2021, to answer the complaint. Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/20/2021. (K,K)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Stipulation filed by Noco Company. Related document(s) #3 , #1 .(Bullock, Anna)
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon USA Topdon, LLC on 8/6/2021, filed on behalf of Noco Company. (Wrong date on the green card. Signature date obtained from USPS website). Related document(s) #3 . (R,AP)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Noco Company. (Welsh, Alexander)
August 2, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to USA Topdon, LLC placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7019 0160 0000 4949 2895. (R,AP)
August 2, 2021 Notice of Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Local Rule 3.13(c) requires the filing of the #AO121 Copyright Report Form or #AO120 Patent and Trademark Report Form by 8/9/2021. (W,Na)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Shenzhen Dingjiang Technology Co., Ltd. and USA Topdon, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (L,MI)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noco Company. (Welsh, Alexander)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Shenzhen Dingjiang Technology Co., Ltd. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10959793. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 23 United States Design Patent Number D867,985, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons). (Welsh, Alexander)
July 30, 2021 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (L,MI)
July 30, 2021 This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (L,MI)
July 30, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,MI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noco Company v. Shenzhen Dingjiang Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Represented By: Anna Elaine Bullock
Represented By: Derek P. Hartman
Represented By: Jon J. Pinney
Represented By: Alexander M. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Dingjiang Technology Co., Ltd. doing business as Topdon
Represented By: Halden R. Schwallie
Represented By: Michael N. Ungar
Represented By: Richard S. Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Topdon, LLC doing business as Topdon
Represented By: Halden R. Schwallie
Represented By: Michael N. Ungar
Represented By: Richard S. Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?