Gardi v. HCA Plan Administration Committee et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Gardi
Defendant: HCA Plan Administration Committee, HCA, Inc. and United Health Care Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01504
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by HCA, Inc.. HCA, Inc. waiver sent on 9/24/2021, answer due 11/23/2021 filed on behalf of HCA, Inc. (Constantine, Randall)
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by HCA Plan Administration Committee. HCA Plan Administration Committee waiver sent on 9/24/2021, answer due 11/23/2021 filed on behalf of HCA Plan Administration Committee (Constantine, Randall)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference on 10/12/2021 at 10:15 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 9/1/2021. (M,S)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Randall A. Constantine filed by on behalf of HCA Plan Administration Committee, HCA, Inc.. (Constantine, Randall)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, and were not issued. (L,MI)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Joseph Gardi. Related document(s) #1 . (Stalzer, John)
August 3, 2021 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (L,MI)
August 3, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,MI)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10963888. Filed by Joseph Gardi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summary Plan Description) (Stalzer, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardi v. HCA Plan Administration Committee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA Plan Administration Committee
Represented By: Randall A. Constantine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA, Inc.
Represented By: Randall A. Constantine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Health Care Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gardi
Represented By: John B. Stalzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?