Wehbe, et al v. Kesecker, et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Wehbe and Reaghan Norton
Defendant: Travis Kesecker, Eugene Shippy, III, Kathryn Kesecker and John Does
Case Number: 1:2021cv01543
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] In light of the filing of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, the CMC currently set for 10/28/21 is cancelled and will be rescheduled after the Court rules on the pending Motion. In accordance with Local Rule 7.1, Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is due within thirty (30) days, i.e., by no later than October 25, 2021. Defendants may file a Reply Brief within fourteen days after service of the Brief in Opposition. (Related document(s) #7 ). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 9/24/2021. (H,SP)
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 Motion to dismiss or in the alternative, Motion for summary judgment filed by Kathryn Kesecker, Travis Kesecker, Eugene Shippy, III. (Attachments: #1 police reports, #2 county complaint)(S,SR)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 Application to Clerk for entry of default against Kathryn Kesecker filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of online docket showing service, #2 Exhibit B - Military Status Report). (Holland, David)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 Application to Clerk for entry of default against Travis Kesecker filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of online docket showing service, #2 Exhibit B - Military Status Report). (Holland, David)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 Application to Clerk for entry of default against Eugene Shippy, III filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of online docket showing service, #2 Exhibit B - Military Status Report). (Holland, David)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held telephonically on 10/28/2021 at 01:30 PM. The Court will provide counsel, via email, instructions for accessing the conference call. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order and to familiarize themselves with the deadlines imposed as not all deadlines are contained in the text of this docket entry. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Pro Se)(P,K)
September 17, 2021 Copy of #3 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order, Report of Parties'Planning Meeting, CMC Pro Se Guide, and telephone instructions mailed to Pro Se Defendants Travis Kesecker, 30050 Euclid Avenue, Ste. E-3, Wickliffe, OH 44092; Eugene Shippy, III, 1972 Chelford Ave., Richmond Heights, OH 44143; Kathryn Kesecker 30050 Euclid Avenue, Ste. E-3, Wickliffe, OH 44092 on 9/17/2021. (P,K)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,MT)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court, case number CV-21-948936 with jury demand, Filing fee paid. $402.00. Receipt #14660133234. Filed by Eugene Shippy, III, Travis Kesecker, Kathryn Kesecker. (Attachments: #1 Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Docket, #2 CV-21-948936 Case Information, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (M,MT)
August 9, 2021 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (M,MT)
August 9, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (M,MT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wehbe, et al v. Kesecker, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Wehbe
Represented By: David R. Holland
Represented By: Nicholas E. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reaghan Norton
Represented By: David R. Holland
Represented By: Nicholas E. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Kesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Shippy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Kesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?