National Products Inc. v. F&V Corp.
Plaintiff: National Products Inc.
Defendant: F&V Corp. doing business as Bulletpoint and F&V Corp. doing business as Bulletpoint Mounting Solutions
Case Number: 1:2021cv01553
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by F&V Corp. (Borell, John)
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 Stipulated Motion for extension of time until 10/22/2021 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant F&V Corp.. Related document(s) #1 . (Borell, John)
September 24, 2021 Notice by Clerk that F&V Corp failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (L,Br)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #9 Defendant's Stipulated Motion for extension of time until 10/22/2021 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 9/24/2021.(P,K)
September 9, 2021 Filing 8 Stipulated Patent Protective Order regarding confidential documents. (Related documents #7 ). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 9/9/2021. (W,CM)
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Stipulation Patent Protective Order filed by F&V Corp.. (Borell, John)
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 Stipulated Motion for extension of time until 10/1/2021 to answer respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant F&V Corp. Related document(s) #1 . (Borell, John)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #6 Defendant's Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time until 10/1/2021 to answer/respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 8/31/2021.(P,K)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by John A. Borell, Jr filed by on behalf of F&V Corp.. (Borell, John)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon F&V Corp. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (L,MI)
August 10, 2021 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (L,MI)
August 10, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (L,MI)
August 10, 2021 This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (L,MI)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by National Products Inc.. (Alexander, Andrew)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by National Products Inc.. (Alexander, Andrew)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint for patent infringement with jury demand against F&V Corp. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number BOHNDC-10974721. Filed by National Products Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ('212 Patent), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons). (Alexander, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Products Inc. v. F&V Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Products Inc.
Represented By: Andrew W. Alexander
Represented By: Mark W. McDougall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F&V Corp. doing business as Bulletpoint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F&V Corp. doing business as Bulletpoint Mounting Solutions
Represented By: John A. Borell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?