MD Auto Group, LLC v. Nissan North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: MD Auto Group, LLC and MD Auto Group, LLC doing business as I-90 Nissan
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01584
Filed: August 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Filing 16 Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26 filed by MD Auto Group, LLC. (DeVito, Christopher)
September 29, 2021 Filing 15 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Under Fed.R.Civ.P.26(f), L.R.16.3(b)(3) and LPR2.1 - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by MD Auto Group, LLC. (DeVito, Christopher)
September 7, 2021 Filing 14 Acknowledgement of receipt of original state court record received on August 31, 2021 from Lorain County Court of Common Pleas. Related document(s) #12 . (L,Br)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 10/15/2021 at 09:00 AM to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 9/03/21. (D,Ma)
August 26, 2021 Filing 12 State court documents received from Lorain County Court of Common Pleas, case number 21CV203874. Original record returned to Lorain County Court with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Lorain County Court) (L,Br)
August 20, 2021 Filing 11 Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Vance, David)
August 18, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by MD Auto Group, LLC. (DeVito, Christopher)
August 17, 2021 Filing 9 Supplement to Motion for attorney Michael A. Kippins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10983406, - Declaration of Michael A. Kippins, filed by Nissan North America, Inc.. Related document(s) #6 . (Vance, David)
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 Supplement to Motion for attorney Brandon L. Bigelow to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10983404, - Declaration of Brandon L. Bigelow, filed by Nissan North America, Inc.. Related document(s) #5 . (Vance, David)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 Supplement to Motion for attorney Alison K. Eggers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10983399, - Declaration of Alison K. Eggers, filed by Nissan North America, Inc.. Related document(s) #4 . (Vance, David)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendant's Motion for attorney Michael A. Kippins to appear pro hac vice is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #6 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 8/16/21. (LC,S)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendant's Motion for attorney Alison K. Eggers to appear pro hac vice is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #4 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 8/16/21. (LC,S)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendant's Motion for attorney Brandon L. Bigelow to appear pro hac vice is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #5 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 8/16/21. (LC,S)
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 Motion for attorney Michael A. Kippins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10983406, filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael A. Kippins (document does not contain an original siganture))(Vance, David) Modified text on 8/16/2021 (M,TL).
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Brandon L. Bigelow to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10983404, filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Declaration of Brandon L. Bigelow (document does not contain an original siganture))(Vance, David) Modified text on 8/16/2021 (M,TL).
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 Motion for attorney Alison K. Eggers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10983399, filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Alison K. Eggers (document does not contain an original siganture)(Vance, David) Modified text on 8/16/2021 (M,TL).
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,Ja)
August 13, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. for Nissan North America, Inc. filed by All Defendants. (Vance, David)
August 13, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Lorain County Court of Common Pleas, case number 21CV203874 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-10982906.. Filed by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Vance, David)
August 13, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,Ja)
August 13, 2021 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. (L,Ja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MD Auto Group, LLC v. Nissan North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MD Auto Group, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. DeVito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MD Auto Group, LLC doing business as I-90 Nissan
Represented By: Christopher M. DeVito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: David R. Vance
Represented By: Alison K. Eggers
Represented By: Brandon L. Bigelow
Represented By: Michael A. Kippins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?