Verba-Boda v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Deborah J Verba-Boda
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2021cv01663
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting attorney Richard B. North's motion to withdraw as counsel of record for defendants. (Related Doc #11 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 9/7/2021.(S,AL)
August 31, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc., Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
August 31, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for C R Bard Incorporated filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
August 30, 2021 Filing 11 Motion by Richard B. North, Jr. to withdraw as attorney filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ghosh, Sanjay)
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Matthew B. Lerner filed by on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Lerner, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Sanjay Ghosh filed by on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
August 30, 2021 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Jennifer S. Heis filed by on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Heis, Jennifer)
August 30, 2021 Notice to Attorney Matthew R. McCarley. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
August 30, 2021 Notice to Attorney Richard B. North, Jr.. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
August 30, 2021 Notice to Attorney Arati C. Furness. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (W,CM)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Amended Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order. (Fifth) signed by Judge David G. Campbell on 8/26/21. (Attachments: #1 Certified Docket Sheet from Arizona)(W,CM)
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona. Case number 2:19-cv-00095. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 26, 2021 Remark by Clerk: This case was transferred from the District of Arizona. All documents were docketed on Arizona's MDL master docket. See # Arizona docket 2:15md2641 for documents. Your PACER login will be required to access the docket/documents. (W,CM)
August 26, 2021 Notice by Clerk: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.13(b), C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated are reminded of their requirement to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. (W,CM)
August 26, 2021 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case pursuant to General Order 2019-17-1. (W,CM)
February 25, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Ohio via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 8/26/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 8/26/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED By Doc. #6 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/18/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 8/26/2021.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-95-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 8/26/2021.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16382427 filed by Deborah J Verba-Boda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 8/26/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verba-Boda v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah J Verba-Boda
Represented By: Arati C. Furness
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Matthew R. McCarley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer S. Heis
Represented By: Matthew B. Lerner
Represented By: Sanjay Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer S. Heis
Represented By: Matthew B. Lerner
Represented By: Sanjay Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?