Union Insurance Company v. Auto Owners Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Union Insurance Company
Defendant: Auto Owners Insurance Company and Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv01706
Filed: September 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Union Insurance Company. (McLaughlin, John)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Reply in support of #7 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company. (Campbell, Drew)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 11/4/2021 at 08:45 AM to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 10/07/21. (D,Ma)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Union Insurance Company. (McLaughlin, John)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FILING ERROR. Blank document. Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Union Insurance Company. (McLaughlin, John)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Opposition to Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Union Insurance Company. Related document(s) #7 . (McLaughlin, John)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company. (Campbell, Drew)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court filed by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court)Related document(s) #1 .(Campbell, Drew)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Selective Insurance Group, Inc. for Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company filed by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company. (Campbell, Drew)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Auto Owners Insurance Company. (Winchester, Brian)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Auto Owners Insurance Company. (Winchester, Brian)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. (L,MI)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice by Clerk that Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (L,MI)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-21-950559 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-11014050. Filed by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company, Auto Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Campbell, Drew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union Insurance Company v. Auto Owners Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Insurance Company
Represented By: John F. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian T. Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Drew H. Campbell
Represented By: Ali I. Haque
Represented By: Lindsey A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?