Ruic v. Receivable Management Services LLC
Plaintiff: Therese Ruic
Defendant: Receivable Management Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01869
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The Court is in receipt of a Notice of Settlement. The Court anticipates a dismissal entry on or before 12/20/21. All dates are hereby stayed. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 11/5/21. (LC,S) re #8
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Settlement filed by Therese Ruic. (Levin, David)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendant's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is granted to 11/24/21. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 11/2/21. (LC,S) re #7
November 1, 2021 Filing 7 Motion for extension of time until November 24, 2021 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (AGREED) filed by Defendant Receivable Management Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stromquist, Matthew)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Receivable Management Services LLC. (Stromquist, Matthew)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendant's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Matthew O. Stromquist is granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #5 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 10/26/21.(LC,S)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Matthew O. Stomquist to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 14660134712, filed by Defendant Receivable Management Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Matthew O. Stromquist, #2 Certificate of Admission to the Bar of Illinois)(W,CM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2021: #3 Cover Letter) (W,CM).
October 19, 2021 Filing 4 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Receivable Management Services LLC on 10/13/2021, filed on behalf of Therese Ruic (Levin, David)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 11/22/2021 at 09:30 AM to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 10/07/21. (D,Ma)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Receivable Management Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,MT)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Receivable Management Services LLC. Filing fee paid $402.00, Receipt number AOHNDC-11061436. Filed by Therese Ruic. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to be Issued) (Levin, David)
September 30, 2021 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. (M,MT)
September 30, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (M,MT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruic v. Receivable Management Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Therese Ruic
Represented By: David B. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Receivable Management Services LLC
Represented By: Matthew O. Stromquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?