Bleich v. Cleveland Brewing Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Benjamin Bleich
Defendant: Cleveland Brewing Company, LLC doing business as Butcher and the Brewer
Case Number: 1:2021cv01891
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 11/29/21 setting a case management conference on 1/7/2022 at 10:00 AM to be held by video conference (Cleveland) before Judge James S. Gwin. The Court requires the attendance of named parties, lead counsel, and a representative with full settlement authority. (Attachments: #1 Parties' Planning Meeting Report, #2 Local Rule 30.1)(T,A)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cleveland Brewing Company, LLC. (Jakubs, Michele)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Cleveland Brewing Company, LLC. (Jakubs, Michele)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Cleveland Brewing Company, LLC c/o Jason Workman on 10/29/2021, filed on behalf of Benjamin Bleich Related document(s) #2 . (L,Br)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by Benjamin Bleich. (Attachments: #1 Peyton Lunder consent form)(Grimsley, Matthew)
October 12, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Cleveland Brewing Company, LLC placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7020 1290 0000 0869 1782. (M,MT)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Benjamin Bleich. (Attachments: #1 Rebekah Kramer Consent Form, #2 Nolan McDonald Consent Form, #3 James C. Soules Consent Form)(Grimsley, Matthew)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to Counsel for service upon Cleveland Brewing Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,Ja)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Cleveland Brewing Company, LLC. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11069357.. Filed by Benjamin Bleich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Cleveland Brewing Company, LLC) (Grimsley, Matthew)
October 5, 2021 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (L,Ja)
October 5, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,Ja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bleich v. Cleveland Brewing Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Bleich
Represented By: Alanna B. Klein Fischer
Represented By: Anthony J. Lazzaro
Represented By: Lori M. Griffin
Represented By: Matthew S. Grimsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland Brewing Company, LLC doing business as Butcher and the Brewer
Represented By: Michele L. Jakubs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?