Noco Company v. Sigma Solution LLC
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Defendant: Sigma Solution LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02130
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Joint Motion to Continue the January 7, 2022 Case Management Conference is granted to February 7, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 12/20/21. (LC,S) (Related Doc #10 )
December 17, 2021 Filing 10 Stipulated Motion to continue Case Management Conference for 30 days filed by Defendant Sigma Solution LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hunter, Anthony)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is granted to 1/10/22. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 12/7/21. (LC,S) re #9
December 6, 2021 Filing 9 Motion for extension of time until Jan. 10, 2022 to answer complaint filed by Defendant Sigma Solution LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Extension)(Hunter, Anthony)
December 2, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 1/7/2022 at 09:00 AM at to be held telephonically before Judge Patricia A. Gaughan.. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 12/02/21. (D,Ma)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 1/7/2022 at 09:00 AM to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 12/02/21. (D,Ma)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Sigma Solution LLC, on 11/15/2021, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Noco Company Related document(s) #3 . (L,Br)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Sigma Solution LLC c/o United States Corporation Agents Inc. on 11/15/2021, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Noco Company Related document(s) #3 . (L,Br)
November 11, 2021 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Noco Company. (Pinney, Jon)
November 10, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Sigma Solution, LLC, Receipt # 7018 1830 0000 3010 1263 and to Sigma Solution, LLC c/o United States Corporation Agents, Inc., Receipt # 7018 1830 0000 3010 1270. Placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (V,AR)
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Sigma Solution LLC. (Two addresses) (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (L,MI)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noco Company. (Pinney, Jon)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Sigma Solution LLC. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11125342.. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant's Sales on www.Walmart.com, #3 Exhibit 3 - September 9, 2021 Cease & Desist Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (Pinney, Jon)
November 9, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,MI)
November 9, 2021 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. (L,MI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noco Company v. Sigma Solution LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Represented By: Alexander M. Welsh
Represented By: Anna Elaine Bullock
Represented By: Derek P. Hartman
Represented By: Jon J. Pinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sigma Solution LLC
Represented By: Anthony L. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?