Branch v. Matia
Petitioner: Marcus A Branch
Respondent: David T Matia
Case Number: 1:2021cv02152
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of Dismissal: The Court DISMISSES the petition for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2254 WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. Further, the Court finds, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Judge Sara Lioi on 1/6/2022. (P,G)
January 6, 2022 Copy of #4 Order Dismissing Case, mailed to Marcus A Branch at A774701, Trumbull Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 901, Leavittsburg, OH 44430 on 1/6/2022. (P,G)
November 19, 2021 Copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) mailed to Marcus A. Branch at A774701 Trumbull Correctional Institution P.O. Box 901 Leavittsburg, OH 44430 on 11/12/2021. Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (D,Th)
November 16, 2021 Financial Transaction in the amount of 5.00 received from Marcus A. Branch. Receipt # 44660005967. Related document(s) #1 . (G,M)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 11/12/2021. (D,Th)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 DUPLICATE FILING: SEE DOCUMENT #3 : Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan 11/12/2021. (D,Th)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee not paid. Filed by Marcus A Branch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Petition Instructions, #3 envelope) (D,Th)
November 12, 2021 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (D,Th)
November 12, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (D,Th)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch v. Matia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marcus A Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David T Matia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?