Fipps et al v. Wood Cove III, et al
Plaintiff: Theodis Fipps and Faith Act Ministries
Defendant: Minister Lesley Green, Wood Cove III, Sanhu Law Group, LLC, Andrew Tomko, N.P. Weis Law, Nicholas P. Weiss, Usha Pillai IRA, LLC, Cuyahoga County Sheriff's Department, Chris Viland, Magistrate Christopher E. Day, Christopher E. Day and John and Jane Does 1-30
Case Number: 1:2021cv02249
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Response in opposition to #10 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Theodis Fipps, Lesley Green. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 A- Copy of previously filed motion to dimiss, #3 B- Copy of previosuly filed brief in support, #4 C- Copy of certified mail receipt)(M,KS)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Order on Motion for extension of time to file response/reply to motion, mailed to Theodis Fipps, Lesley Green, and Faith Act Ministries at 3634 Runnymede Blvd. Cleveland Heights, OH 44121 on 1/26/2022. (R,Sh)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Petitioners' #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' #12 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim , and #10 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim . Petitioners' shall have 14 days to respond from the date of this Order. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 1/26/2022.(R,Sh)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Motion for extension of time to file response to #10 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim and #12 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Theodis Fipps and Lesley Green. Related document(s) #10 , #12 . (R,AP)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Attorney Appearance by Bridget M. Sciscento filed by on behalf of N.P. Weis Law, Usha Pillai IRA, LLC, Nicholas P. Weiss. (Sciscento, Bridget)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Cuyahoga County Sheriff's Department, Christopher E. Day, Christopher E. Day, Chris Viland. (O'Leary, Samuel)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by Samuel T. O'Leary filed by on behalf of Cuyahoga County Sheriff's Department, Christopher E. Day, Chris Viland. (O'Leary, Samuel)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by N.P. Weis Law, Usha Pillai IRA, LLC, Nicholas P. Weiss. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Docket from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas) (Turner, Mark)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Mark M. Turner filed by on behalf of N.P. Weis Law, Usha Pillai IRA, LLC, Nicholas P. Weiss. (Turner, Mark)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Wood Cove III. Service attempted by certified mail on 12/8/2021, marked attempted not known filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 .
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of #8 Return of Service Unexecuted mailed to Theodis Fipps at 3634 Runnymede Blvd. Cleveland Heights, OH 44121 on 12/14/2021. (S,SR)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Andrew Tomko on 12/2/2021. Filed on behalf of Faith Act Ministries; Theodis Fipps. (M,CE)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Cuyahoga County Sheriff's Department on 12/2/2021, filed on behalf of Faith Act Ministries; Theodis Fipps Related document(s) #1 . (L,Ja)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Sanhu Law Group, LLC on 12/2/2021. Filed on behalf of Faith Act Ministries; Theodis Fipps. (M,CE)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Christopher E. Day on 12/2/2021. Filed on behalf of Faith Act Ministries; Theodis Fipps. (M,CE)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Non Party, United State of America on 12/1/2021, filed on behalf of Faith Act Ministries and Theodis Fipps Related document(s) #1 . (L,Ja)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Motion for temporary restraining order filed by Faith Act Ministries. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Quit Claim Deed)(L,Ja)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid. 402.00. Receipt # 14660135360 Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:21cv2244. Filed by Faith Act Ministries, Theodis Fipps. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Facts, #2 Exhibit A Special Rules with Respect to Section 501c, #3 Exhibit B Joinder of Parties, #4 Exhibit C Selecting Parcels, #5 Exhibit D Cuyhaoga Docket, #6 Exhibit E Secretary of State, #7 Exhibit F Certificate, #8 Exhibit G Checks, #9 Exhibit H Deed, #10 Exhibit I Writ of Possession, #11 Exhibit J Cuyahoga Couny Complaint, #12 Exhibit K Cuyahoga County Docket, #13 Case Designation Sheet) (L,Ja)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (L,Ja)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Christopher E. Day, 7021 2720 0002 4895 9255 / 959009402 7109 1251 3753 88 N.P. Weis Law, 7021 2720 0002 4895 9200 Sanhu Law Group, LLC, 7021 2720 0002 4895 9262 Andrew Tomko, 7021 2720 0002 4895 9224 Usha Pillai IRA, LLC, 7021 2720 0002 4895 9217 Nicholas P. Weiss 7021 2720 0002 4895 9248, Wood Cove III 7021 2720 0002 4895 9321 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (L,Ja)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,Ja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fipps et al v. Wood Cove III, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodis Fipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faith Act Ministries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minister Lesley Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wood Cove III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanhu Law Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Tomko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.P. Weis Law
Represented By: Bridget M. Sciscento
Represented By: Mark M. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas P. Weiss
Represented By: Bridget M. Sciscento
Represented By: Mark M. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Usha Pillai IRA, LLC
Represented By: Bridget M. Sciscento
Represented By: Mark M. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuyahoga County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Samuel T. O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Viland
Represented By: Samuel T. O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magistrate Christopher E. Day
Represented By: Samuel T. O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher E. Day
Represented By: Samuel T. O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?