Buon Vino Manufacturing, Inc. v. Ostrowski
Plaintiff: Buon Vino Manufacturing, Inc.
Defendant: Lukas Ostrowski, Lukas Ostrowski doing business as Richmond Winery also known as Ubrew USA and Ubrew USA
Case Number: 1:2021cv02268
Filed: December 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Filing 6 Application to Clerk for entry of default against Lukas Ostrowski filed by Buon Vino Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Jones, Alex)
January 28, 2022 Filing 5 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Lukas Ostrowski on 12/20/2021, filed on behalf of Buon Vino Manufacturing, Inc. Related document(s) #2 , #1 . (Jones, Alex)
January 28, 2022 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Buon Vino Manufacturing, Inc.. (Jones, Alex)
January 4, 2022 Filing 3 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference on 2/15/2022 at 09:00 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 1/4/2022. (M,S)
December 15, 2021 Notice of Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Local Rule 3.13(c) requires the filing of the #AO121 Copyright Report Form or #AO120 Patent and Trademark Report Form by 12/22/2021. (W,Na)
December 2, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to Counsel for service upon Lukas Ostrowski. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,Ja)
December 2, 2021 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (L,Ja)
December 2, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,Ja)
December 1, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Lukas Ostrowski. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11159763.. Filed by Buon Vino Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Buon Vino Resale Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's TM Application, #3 Exhibit C - The First Letter, #4 Exhibit D - The Second Letter, #5 Exhibit E - The Third Letter, #6 Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jones, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buon Vino Manufacturing, Inc. v. Ostrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buon Vino Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Alex E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lukas Ostrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lukas Ostrowski doing business as Richmond Winery also known as Ubrew USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ubrew USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?