Simmons v. Henkel US Operations Corporation
Plaintiff: Charles Simmons
Defendant: Henkel US Operations Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv02358
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of Case Management Conference with telephonic case management conference to be held on 3/14/22 at 3:30 PM before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. This Court requires the participation of lead counsel. The Court will host the conference call and inform counsel by way of separate email of the telephone number for the conference call. Parties shall be available by phone, if needed (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, #2 Consent Package)(L,Ja)
January 28, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Henkel AG & Co. KGaA for Henkel US Operations Corporation filed by Henkel US Operations Corporation. (Jakubs, Michele)
January 28, 2022 Filing 5 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Henkel US Operations Corporation. (Jakubs, Michele)
January 14, 2022 Filing 4 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Henkel US Operations Corporation on 1/7/2022, filed on behalf of Charles Simmons. Related document(s) #2 . (M,KS)
January 3, 2022 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Henkel US Operations Corporation placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70190700000010660935. (L,Br)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by Charles Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Wyatt Clements Consent Form, #2 Ronald L. Crawford, Jr. Consent Form, #3 Charles Simmons Consent Form, #4 Ajua Woods Consent Form)(Griffin, Lori)
December 17, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Henkel US Operations Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (L,MI)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Henkel US Operations Corporation. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11186033.. Filed by Charles Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Henkel US Corporation) (Griffin, Lori)
December 17, 2021 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (L,MI)
December 17, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,MI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Henkel US Operations Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Simmons
Represented By: Alanna B. Klein Fischer
Represented By: Anthony J. Lazzaro
Represented By: Matthew S. Grimsley
Represented By: Lori M. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henkel US Operations Corporation
Represented By: Jessi L. Ziska
Represented By: Michele L. Jakubs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?