ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan v. Cephalon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Allergan Sales, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., ORTH-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., n/k/a/ JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC., n/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc. Salt Lake City, Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Actavis Totowa, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc, Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Endo International PLC, Noramco, Inc., Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc. Florida, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. f/k/a Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a/ Watson Pharma, Inc. and Allergan USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021op45013
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Filing 32 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 3/22/2021, answer due 5/21/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
March 23, 2021 Filing 31 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 3/22/2021, answer due 5/21/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
March 23, 2021 Filing 30 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. f/k/a Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 3/22/2021, answer due 5/21/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
March 23, 2021 Filing 29 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 3/22/2021, answer due 5/21/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
March 19, 2021 Filing 28 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 3/18/2021, answer due 5/17/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
March 15, 2021 Filing 27 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. AmerisourceBergen Corporation waiver sent on 3/15/2021, answer due 5/14/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
March 9, 2021 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC waiver sent on 3/8/2021, answer due 5/7/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
March 9, 2021 Filing 25 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 3/8/2021, answer due 5/7/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
March 9, 2021 Filing 24 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Allergan Sales, LLC waiver sent on 3/8/2021, answer due 5/7/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
March 9, 2021 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Allergan USA, Inc. waiver sent on 3/8/2021, answer due 5/7/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
February 23, 2021 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Noramco, Inc. waiver sent on 2/23/2021, answer due 4/26/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
February 23, 2021 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 2/23/2021, answer due 4/26/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 2/18/2021, answer due 4/19/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Warner Chilcott Company, LLC waiver sent on 2/18/2021, answer due 4/19/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 2/18/2021, answer due 4/19/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. waiver sent on 2/18/2021, answer due 4/19/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 2/18/2021, answer due 4/19/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Actavis Totowa, LLC waiver sent on 2/18/2021, answer due 4/19/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Actavis South Atlantic LLC waiver sent on 2/18/2021, answer due 4/19/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a/ Watson Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 2/18/2021, answer due 4/19/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC waiver sent on 2/18/2021, answer due 4/19/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 2/18/2021, answer due 4/19/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc. Salt Lake City waiver sent on 2/18/2021, answer due 4/19/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc. Florida waiver sent on 2/18/2021, answer due 4/19/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Actavis Kadian LLC waiver sent on 2/18/2021, answer due 4/19/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Actavis Elizabeth LLC waiver sent on 2/18/2021, answer due 4/19/2021 filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan (Piers, Matthew)
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (P,R)
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Emily R. Brown filed by on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. (Brown, Emily)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Caryn C. Lederer filed on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. (P,R)
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 Attorney Appearance by Matthew J. Piers filed by on behalf of ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. (Piers, Matthew)
February 5, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. (Piers, Matthew)
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10624162. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 17-MD-2804. Filed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons) (Piers, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan v. Cephalon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTH-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., n/k/a/ JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC., n/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc. Salt Lake City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc. Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. f/k/a Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a/ Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan
Represented By: Matthew J. Piers
Represented By: Caryn C. Lederer
Represented By: Emily R. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?