Copiah County, Mississippi v. Mallinckrodt plc et al
Plaintiff: Copiah County, Mississippi
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., SpecGX LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Cardinal Health Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation and Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals
Case Number: 1:2021op45029
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Filing 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Mississippi Southern. Case number 3:21-cv-00094. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 22, 2021 Notified IT Department to electronically transfer case to the Northern District of Ohio. (KNS) [Transferred from mssd on 2/23/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. (KNS) [Transferred from mssd on 2/23/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: Transferring case to the United States District Court for Northern District of Ohio. (KNS) [Transferred from mssd on 2/23/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Edderek Linnel Cole on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Cole, Edderek) [Transferred from mssd on 2/23/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint as to Defendants AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., and McKesson Corporation (collectively "Distributor Defendants"). The deadline for Distributor Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is 4/5/2021. In the event a motion to remand is filed or this case is transferred to Opiate Multi-District Litigation, Distributor Defendants' response shall be due within 30 days after (i) a ruling on any motion to remand or (ii) a final decision of the United States Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. The latest of these dates shall control. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 2/11/2021. (dcw) [Transferred from mssd on 2/23/2021.]
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Defendants Johnson & Johnson; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; and Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. The deadline for these Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is 4/5/2021. In the event a motion to remand is filed or this case is transferred to Opiate Multi-District Litigation, their responses shall be due within 30 days after (i) a ruling on any motion to remand or (ii) a final decision of the United States Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. The latest of these dates shall control. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 2/10/2021. (dcw) [Transferred from mssd on 2/23/2021.]
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Richmond, Orlando) [Transferred from mssd on 2/23/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,, by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation (Forks, Joseph) [Transferred from mssd on 2/23/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Miles Forks on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Forks, Joseph) [Transferred from mssd on 2/23/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. from Circuit Court of Copiah County, Mississippi, case number 20-400. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 34643062330) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Attachment Notice, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM) [Transferred from mssd on 2/23/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copiah County, Mississippi v. Mallinckrodt plc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Robert L. Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Orlando R. Richmond, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Orlando R. Richmond, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Orlando R. Richmond, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Wilton V. Byars, III
Represented By: Joseph Miles Forks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Edderek Linnel Cole
Represented By: Thomas W. Tardy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Copiah County, Mississippi
Represented By: John Wimberly Kitchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?