Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kodiak Area Native Association, Bristol Bay Area Health Corporation, Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium, Aleutian Pribilof Islands Association, Inc., Norton Sound Health Corporation and Southeast Alaska Regional Health Consortium
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021op45043
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Case transferred from Ohio Northern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:21-cv-04968, filed 06/28/2021. (O,K)
June 24, 2021 Termination of case (P,R)
June 22, 2021 Filing 13 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 1) by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigaiton. In re: MDL 2996 McKinsey & Company, Inc., National Prescription Opiate Consultant Litigation. Case transferred to the Northern District of California and assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (P,R)
April 23, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Filing with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motion to Transfer for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Baker, Amanda)
April 6, 2021 Filing 11 Proposed Stipulation filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint)Related document(s) #1 .(Baker, Amanda)
April 6, 2021 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. McKinsey & Company, Inc. waiver sent on 3/31/2021, answer due 5/31/2021 filed on behalf of McKinsey & Company, Inc. (Baker, Amanda)
April 6, 2021 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Amanda K. Baker filed by on behalf of McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Baker, Amanda)
April 6, 2021 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Norton Sound Health Corporation, Bristol Bay Area Health Corporation, Aleutian Pribilof Islands Association, Inc., Southeast Alaska Regional Health Consortium, Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium, Kodiak Area Native Association. McKinsey & Company, Inc. waiver sent on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021 filed on behalf of Norton Sound Health Corporation; Bristol Bay Area Health Corporation; Aleutian Pribilof Islands Association, Inc.; Southeast Alaska Regional Health Consortium; Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium; Kodiak Area Native Association (Strommer, Geoffrey)
March 25, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Southeast Alaska Regional Health Consortium. (Strommer, Geoffrey)
March 25, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Norton Sound Health Corporation. (Strommer, Geoffrey)
March 25, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Kodiak Area Native Association. (Strommer, Geoffrey)
March 25, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Bristol Bay Area Health Corporation. (Strommer, Geoffrey)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Aleutian Pribilof Islands Association, Inc.. (Strommer, Geoffrey)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium. (Strommer, Geoffrey)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against McKinsey & Company, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10743173. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-02804-DAP. Filed by Norton Sound Health Corporation, Bristol Bay Area Health Corporation, Aleutian Pribilof Islands Association, Inc., Southeast Alaska Regional Health Consortium, Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium, Kodiak Area Native Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Strommer, Geoffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kodiak Area Native Association
Represented By: Geoffrey D. Strommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bristol Bay Area Health Corporation
Represented By: Geoffrey D. Strommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium
Represented By: Geoffrey D. Strommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleutian Pribilof Islands Association, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey D. Strommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norton Sound Health Corporation
Represented By: Geoffrey D. Strommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southeast Alaska Regional Health Consortium
Represented By: Geoffrey D. Strommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda K. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?