Allstate Indemnity Company v. Broan Nutone, LLC et al.
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Defendant: Broan Nutone LLC and John Doe Manfacturer
Case Number: 1:2022cv00032
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: J Philip Calabrese
Referring Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation, Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC for Allstate Indemnity Company filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. (O'Malley, Patrick)
February 25, 2022 Filing 11 Combined Opposition to #8 Motion to Amend Complaint and Reply to response to #4 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Broan Nutone LLC. (Chapman, Michael)
February 25, 2022 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - Duplicate document. See #11 Response to #8 Motion to amend complaint filed by Broan Nutone LLC. (Chapman, Michael) Modified on 3/1/2022 (L,Br).
February 17, 2022 Notice by Clerk that Allstate Indemnity Company failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (L,Br)
February 17, 2022 Filing 9 Opposition to #4 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support)(O'Malley, Patrick)
February 16, 2022 Filing 8 Motion to amend complaint filed by Plaintiff Allstate Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 First Amended Complaint)(O'Malley, Patrick)
February 2, 2022 Filing 7 Motion for extension of time until 02/18/2022 to file response to #4 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim, filed by Plaintiff Allstate Indemnity Company. Related document(s) #4 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). (O'Malley, Patrick)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Plaintiff's motion for an extension to February 18, 2022 to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss is unopposed and granted (ECF No. #7 ). If Plaintiff intends to seek to amend the complaint, as it represents, the Court orders Plaintiff to follow its Civil Standing Order (available on the Court's website) when doing so. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 2/2/2022.(Y,A)
January 13, 2022 Filing 6 Certified copy of state court documents received from Medina County Court of Common Pleas case number 21CIV0960. (M,KS)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 1/11/2022. (R,Sh)
January 11, 2022 Judge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. terminated. (L,MI)
January 7, 2022 Filing 4 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Broan Nutone LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Dismissal)(Chapman, Michael)
January 7, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Nortek Inc. for Broan Nutone LLC filed by Broan Nutone LLC. (Chapman, Michael)
January 7, 2022 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,Ja)
January 7, 2022 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Medina County Common Pleas, case number 21CIV0960 Filing fee paid $ 402.00 receipt number AOHNDC-11211583. Filed by broan nutone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record, #2 Exhibit Secretary of State - Citizenship Records, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing In State Court of Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet) (Chapman, Michael)
January 7, 2022 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (L,Ja)
January 7, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,Ja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Indemnity Company v. Broan Nutone, LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Patrick J. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan Nutone LLC
Represented By: Michael P. Foley
Represented By: Michael J. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Manfacturer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?