Jelenic v. Zaremba Management Co.
Plaintiff: Phillip Jelenic
Defendant: Zaremba Management Co.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00093
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2022 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Zaremba Management Co.. (Chyun, Edward)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/17/22 granting defendant's #7 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until March 18, 2022 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint or Otherwise Plead. Zaremba Management Co. answer due 3/18/2022.(T,A)
February 15, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Zaremba Management Co. (Frondorf, Alexander)
February 15, 2022 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until March 18, 2022 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint or Otherwise Plead, filed by Defendant Zaremba Management Co. Related document(s) #1 . (Chyun, Edward)
January 31, 2022 Filing 6 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Zaremba Management Co. on 1/26/2022, ( marked C-19) filed on behalf of Phillip Jelenic Related document(s) #2 . (I,RA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2022: #1 Corrected Green Card) (I,RA).
January 28, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Filing Consent to Join Form Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Phillip Jelenic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form)(Nilges, Hans)
January 27, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Consent to Join Form Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Phillip Jelenic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form)(Nilges, Hans)
January 24, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Consent to Join Form Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Phillip Jelenic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form)(Nilges, Hans)
January 24, 2022 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Zaremba Management Co. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt #7021 2720 0001 9499 8490. (M,KS)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Zaremba Management Co. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,Ja)
January 18, 2022 Filing 1 Collective Action Complaint with jury demand against Zaremba Management Co. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11225787. Filed by Phillip Jelenic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons). (Nilges, Hans)
January 18, 2022 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (L,Ja)
January 18, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,Ja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jelenic v. Zaremba Management Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Jelenic
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zaremba Management Co.
Represented By: Alexander R. Frondorf
Represented By: Edward H. Chyun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?