Hamdan v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Layann I. Hamdan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2022cv00106
Filed: January 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: William H Baughman
Referring Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 425 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order setting procedural schedule as follows; Plaintiff's brief on merits due 04/19/22, Defendant's brief on merits due 05/19/22, Plaintiff's reply, if any, due 06/02/22, Joint certification of meet & confer due 06/16/22. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 03/17/22. (M,MT)
March 14, 2022 Filing 5 Transcript of Proceedings before the Social Security Administration filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Related document(s) #1 . (Staley Rafferty, Cara)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 02/02/22.(M,MT)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 01/19/22. (M,MT)
January 19, 2022 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,Ja)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Layann I Hamdan. (Balin, Paulette)
January 19, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Layann I Hamdan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Balin, Paulette)
January 19, 2022 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (L,Ja)
January 19, 2022 Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (L,Ja)
January 19, 2022 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 1/19/2022. (L,Ja)
January 19, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,Ja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamdan v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Layann I. Hamdan
Represented By: Matthew J. Shupe
Represented By: Paulette F. Balin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Cara Staley Rafferty
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?