Anderson v. Rent-A-Daughter Corp.
Plaintiff: Kim Anderson
Defendant: Rent-A-Daughter Corp., Rent A Daugher LLC, Rent A Daughter Franchising LLC, Rent A Daughter Concierge Service LLC and Nadine Glatley
Case Number: 1:2022cv00143
Filed: January 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Referring Judge: Bridget Meehan Brennan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2022 Filing 20 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Rent A Daugher LLC on 3/23/2022, filed on behalf of Kim Anderson (Nilges, Hans)
March 21, 2022 Filing 19 Alias Summons issued to counsel for service upon Nadine Glatley and Rent A Daugher LLC. (S,HR)
March 21, 2022 Filing 18 Praecipe for issuance of Alias Summons for Rent A Daugher LLC filed by Kim Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Nilges, Hans)
March 18, 2022 Filing 17 Praecipe for issuance of Alias Summons for Nadine Glately filed by Kim Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Nilges, Hans)
March 16, 2022 Filing 16 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Rent A Daughter Franchising LLC on 3/14/2022, filed on behalf of Kim Anderson (Nilges, Hans)
March 16, 2022 Filing 15 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Rent A Daughter Concierge Service LLC on 3/14/2022, filed on behalf of Kim Anderson (Nilges, Hans)
March 16, 2022 Filing 14 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Rent-A-Daughter Corp. on 3/14/2022, filed on behalf of Kim Anderson. Related document(s) #10 . (Nilges, Hans)
March 15, 2022 Filing 13 Notice Of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Kim Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent Form)(Nilges, Hans)
March 14, 2022 Filing 12 Motion for class certification and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs, with memorandum in support, filed by Plaintiff Kim Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Notice and Consent to Join Form, #2 Exhibit B-Declarations).(Baishnab, Robi)
March 14, 2022 Filing 11 Notice Of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Kim Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent Form)(Nilges, Hans)
March 9, 2022 Filing 10 Alias Summons issued to counsel for service upon Rent-A-Daughter Corp.. (L,Br)
March 9, 2022 Filing 9 Praecipe for issuance of Alias Summons filed by Kim Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Nilges, Hans)
March 8, 2022 Filing 8 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Nadine Glatley, Rent A Daugher LLC, Rent A Daughter Concierge Service LLC, Rent A Daughter Franchising LLC. (L,Br)
March 4, 2022 Filing 7 First Amended complaint against Rent-A-Daughter Corp. and adding new party defendant(s) Rent A Daughter LLC; Rent A Daughter Franchising LLC; Rent A Daughter Concierge Service LLC; Nadine Glatley. Filed by Kim Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Summons RE Rent A Daughter LLC, #2 Summons RE Rent A Daughter Franchising LLC, #3 Summons RE Rent A Daughter Concierge Service LLC, #4 Summons RE Nadine Glatley) (Nilges, Hans)
March 3, 2022 Filing 6 Notice Of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Kim Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent Form)(Nilges, Hans)
February 24, 2022 Filing 5 Notice Of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Kim Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent Form)(Nilges, Hans)
February 23, 2022 Random Reassignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2022-04. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (S,HR)
February 22, 2022 Case reassigned to District Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan pursuant to General Order 2022-04. (G,M)
February 17, 2022 Filing 4 Notice Of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Kim Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent Form)(Nilges, Hans)
February 14, 2022 Filing 3 Notice Of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Kim Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent Form)(Nilges, Hans)
February 2, 2022 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Rent-A-Daughter Corp. c/o Nadine Glatley placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt #7021 2720 0001 9499 9053. (R,AP)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to Counsel for service upon Rent-A-Daughter Corp. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,Ja)
January 27, 2022 Filing 1 Class and Collection Action Complaint with jury demand against Rent-A-Daughter Corp. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11242462. Filed by Kim Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A-Consent Form). (Nilges, Hans)
January 27, 2022 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (L,Ja)
January 27, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,Ja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Rent-A-Daughter Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Anderson
Represented By: Robi J. Baishnab
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rent-A-Daughter Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rent A Daugher LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rent A Daughter Franchising LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rent A Daughter Concierge Service LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadine Glatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?