Doniver v. City of Cleveland
Plaintiff: Barbara Doniver
Defendant: City of Cleveland
Case Number: 1:2022cv00154
Filed: January 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] The Court grants Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time Until April 23, 2022 to File a Responsive Pleading. (ECF #3 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 2/15/2022.(L,Ja)
February 8, 2022 Filing 3 Motion for extension of time until April 23, 2022 to file responsive pleading, filed by Defendant City of Cleveland. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Unsworn Declaration of Mark V. Webber). (Webber, Mark)
February 2, 2022 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Barbara Langhenry City of Cleveland placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70190700000010660812. (S,SR)
January 31, 2022 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon City of Cleveland. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (L,MI)
January 31, 2022 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (L,MI)
January 31, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,MI)
January 28, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against City of Cleveland. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11245597.. Filed by Barbara Doniver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Barbara Doniver's Consent form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Grimsley, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doniver v. City of Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Doniver
Represented By: Matthew S. Grimsley
Represented By: Alanna B. Klein Fischer
Represented By: Anthony J. Lazzaro
Represented By: Lori M. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Cleveland
Represented By: Mark V. Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?