Falkosky v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Edward Falkosky
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2022cv00232
Filed: February 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Referring Judge: Thomas M Parker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2022 Filing 6 Transcript of Proceedings before the Social Security Administration filed by Commissioner of Social Security. Related document(s) #1 . (Staley Rafferty, Cara)
February 11, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (D,JJ)
February 11, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Please note: counsel for the parties are under an obligation to meet and confer prior to the filing of plaintiff's reply brief; see the attached order for specific details. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 2/11/2022. (D,JJ)
February 10, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Social Security Number filed by Edward Falkosky. (Osterhout, Karl)
February 10, 2022 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI)
February 10, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11264709. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be a refiling of a previously remanded case 1:19-cv-02632-TMP. Filed by Edward Falkosky. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to OGC, #3 Summons to Attorney General, #4 Summons to U.S. Attorney) (Osterhout, Karl)
February 10, 2022 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. assigned to case. (L,MI)
February 10, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (L,MI)
February 10, 2022 Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (L,MI)
February 10, 2022 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 2/10/2022. (L,MI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falkosky v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Falkosky
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Cara Staley Rafferty
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?