Fox v. State of Ohio
Petitioner: Robert L. Fox
Respondent: State of Ohio
Case Number: 1:2022cv00252
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jonathan D Greenberg
Referring Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by William H. Lamb filed by on behalf of State of Ohio. (Lamb, William)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Respondent shall file an answer to the petition within 45 days from the date of this order; petitioner shall have 30 days from the filing of respondent's answer to respond; respondent shall have 15 days from the filing of petitioner's reply brief to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 3/17/22. (Issued by ordinary mail to Petitioner and to Respondent, with copy of petition for writ of habeas corpus to Respondent and via email to Brian Higgins, Office of Ohio Attorney General, on 3/17/22)(D,Ky)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Petitioner filed an application to commence suit without the prepayment of costs, fees or security in the above-captioned case. That application is granted. (Related Doc. #1 -2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 3/17/22. (D,Ky)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of #4 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order, #3 Order, mailed to Robert L. Fox #A760447, Richland Correctional Institution, 1001 Olivesburg Road, Mansfield, OH 44905 on 3/17/22. Related document(s) #4 , #3 . (D,Ky)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Entered on behalf of Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/17/2022. (K,K)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee not paid. Filed by Robert L. Fox. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Inmate Demand Statement, #3 Decision and Journal Entry, #4 Envelope). (L,MI)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (L,MI)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox v. State of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert L. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Ohio
Represented By: William H. Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?