Foght v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Sheila Foght
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2022cv00272
Filed: February 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: William H Baughman
Referring Judge: David A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order setting procedural schedule as follows; Plaintiff's brief on merits due 05/16/22, Defendant's brief on merits due 06/15/22, Plaintiff's reply, if any, due 06/29/22, Joint certification of meet & confer due 07/13/22. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 04/14/22. (M,MT)
April 14, 2022 Filing 6 Transcript of Proceedings before the Social Security Administration filed by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. Related document(s) #2 . (Staley Rafferty, Cara)
March 8, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (G,CA)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 03/08/22.(M,MT)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 03/08/22.(M,MT)
February 18, 2022 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (V,AR)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2 Complaint against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Sheila Foght. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Confirmation of SSN disclosure) (Hall, Julie)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Sheila Foght. (Hall, Julie)
February 18, 2022 FILING ERROR. Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action. Judge David A. Ruiz on 02/18/2022. (V,AR) Modified text on 2/18/2022 (S,SR).
February 18, 2022 Judge David A. Ruiz assigned to case. (V,AR)
February 18, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (V,AR)
February 18, 2022 Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (V,AR)
February 18, 2022 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge David A. Ruiz on 2/18/2022. (V,AR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foght v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Foght
Represented By: Julie A. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Represented By: Cara Staley Rafferty
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?