Estate of Thomas J. Freund v. United States Government
Defendant: United States Government
In Re: Estate of Thomas J. Freund
Case Number: 1:2022cv00425
Filed: March 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: J Philip Calabrese
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2410 Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2022 Filing 5 Motion for extension of time until 05/25/22 to file response to #4 Motion to vacate default judgment and permit response to motion filed by In Re [civil] Estate of Thomas J. Freund. Related document(s) #4 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). (Haring, David)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The motion for an extension to May 25, 2022 for the deadline for Thomas Freund to respond to the United States' motion is unopposed and granted (ECF No. #5 ). Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 4/25/2022.(Y,A)
April 12, 2022 Filing 4 Motion to vacate default judgment and permit response to motion, filed by Defendant United States Government. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Judgment Entry of Insolvency, #2 Exhibit B-Application to Probate Will, #3 Exhibit C-Entry Admitting Will to Probate, #4 Exhibit D- July Inventory and Appraisal, #5 Exhibit E-Application to Sell Personal Property, #6 Exhibit F-Application to sell and transfer Motor Vehicle property, #7 Exhibit G-02.08.22 Order Setting Hearing, #8 Exhibit H-Notice of Hearing Served). (Deucher, Elizabeth)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The motion of the United States for an extension to April 18, 2022 to answer, move, or otherwise plead is unopposed and granted (ECF No. #3 ). Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 3/23/2022. (Y,A)
March 22, 2022 Filing 3 Motion for extension of time until April 18, 2022 to answer, or present other defenses or objections filed by Defendant United States Government. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Probate Court Notice and Insolvency Schedule Claims)(Deucher, Elizabeth)
March 17, 2022 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
March 17, 2022 Judge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (L,MI)
March 17, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI)
March 16, 2022 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Probate Court of Richland County, Ohio, case number 20211006 . Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States Government. (Attachments: #1 Probate Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Deucher, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Thomas J. Freund v. United States Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Estate of Thomas J. Freund
Represented By: David N. Haring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Government
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Deucher
Represented By: Steven J. Paffilas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?