Viola v. Kasaris et al
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Anthony Viola
3Rd Party Defendant: Daniel Kasaris, Arvin Clar, Jay Milano, Mark Bennett and United States
Case Number: 1:2022cv00559
Filed: April 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: J Philip Calabrese
Referring Judge: Charles Esque Fleming
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of the ECF for Order mailed to Anthony Viola 2820 Mayfield Road #205 Cleveland Heights, OH 44118 on 5/6/2022. (Y,A)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The Court grants the motion and directs Plaintiff to file a single, consolidated response to Defendants' motions no later than July 18, 2022. (ECF No. #12 .) Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 5/6/2022.(Y,A)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Motion to file consolidated response filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Anthony Viola. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(F,AW)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by 3rd Pty Defendant United States. Related document #1 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration). (Bacchus, Renee)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Motion for extension of time until June 7, 2022 to answer or otherwise plead, filed by 3rd Pty Defendant Jay Milano. Related document(s) #1 . (Milano, Jerome)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: For good cause shown, the Court grants the motion of Jay Milano for an extension to June 7, 2022 to answer, move, or otherwise plead (ECF No. #10 ). Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 4/21/2022.(Y,A)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of the NEF for the Order granting Motion for extension of time to answer mailed to Anthony Viola 2820 Mayfield Road, #205, Cleveland Heights, OH 44118 on 4/21/2022. (Y,A)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order: The Court GRANTS the motion of the United States and SUBSTITUTES the United States in the place and stead of Third-Party Defendant Mark Bennett (ECF No. #6 ). Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 4/19/2022.(Y,A)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Reply in support of #6 Motion to substitute United States in place and stead of Mark Bennett filed by Mark Bennett. (Bacchus, Renee)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of (ECF No. #9 ) Order granting motion to substitute party mailed to Anthony Viola at 2820 Mayfield Road, #205, Cleveland Heights, OH 44118 on 4/20/2022. (Y,A)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Opposition to #6 Motion to substitute United States in place and stead of Mark Bennett filed by Anthony Viola. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Various Court Documents, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(L,Br)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Motion to substitute United States in place and stead of Mark Bennett filed by 3rd Pty Defendant Mark Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Certification)(Bacchus, Renee)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 4/8/2022. (S,SR)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of NEF for the Order granting motion for extension of time to answer, mailed to Anthony Viola at 2820 Mayfield Road, #205, Cleveland Heights, OH 44118 on 4/8/2022. (Y,A)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. Judge Charles Esque Fleming terminated. (H,Ch)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of #5 Order of recusal mailed to Anthony Viola at 2820 Mayfield Road #205 Cleveland Heights, OH 44118 on 4/8/2022. (S,SR)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The Court grants the motion of Third-Party Defendant Mark Bennet for an extension to June 7, 2022 to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to the complaint (ECF No. #3 ). Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 4/8/2022.(Y,A)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (H,Ch)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Motion for extension of time until June 7, 2022 to answer Or Otherwise Plead filed by 3rd Pty Defendant Mark Bennett. (Bacchus, Renee)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Related Cases filed by Mark Bennett. (Bacchus, Renee)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-22-959454 . Filing fee exempt. Filed by Mark Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Third Party Complaint) (Bacchus, Renee)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (H,Ch)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Charles Esque Fleming assigned to case. (H,Ch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viola v. Kasaris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Anthony Viola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Daniel Kasaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Arvin Clar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jay Milano
Represented By: Katelyn M. Pruchnicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Mark Bennett
Represented By: Renee A. Bacchus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: United States
Represented By: Renee A. Bacchus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?