Woolf v. Revolution Trucking, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Allen Woolf
Defendant: Revolution Trucking, LLC, James Adams and Brian Watson
Case Number: 1:2022cv00562
Filed: April 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Charles Esque Fleming
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint filed by James Adams, Revolution Trucking, LLC, Brian Watson. (Melick, Gregory)
April 19, 2022 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Gregory H. Melick and Alexander C. Karcher filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Melick, Gregory) Modified attorneys on 4/19/2022 (M,CE).
April 14, 2022 Filing 4 Supplement to Complaint - Consent to Sue, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 . (Wido, Christopher)
April 14, 2022 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Waivers sent 4/7/2022, answers due 6/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Waiver of Service, #2 Supplement Waiver of Service)(Wido, Christopher) Modified text on 4/14/2022 (S,SR).
April 7, 2022 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon James Adams, Revolution Trucking, LLC, Brian Watson and Revolution Trucking, LLC c/a James Adams, Statutory Agent. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (H,Ch)
April 7, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11361680.. Filed by Allen Woolf. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Wido, Christopher)
April 7, 2022 Judge Charles Esque Fleming assigned to case. (H,Ch)
April 7, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (H,Ch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woolf v. Revolution Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Woolf
Represented By: Christopher P. Wido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revolution Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Alexander C. Karcher
Represented By: Christopher E. Cotter
Represented By: Gregory H. Melick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Adams
Represented By: Alexander C. Karcher
Represented By: Christopher E. Cotter
Represented By: Gregory H. Melick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Watson
Represented By: Alexander C. Karcher
Represented By: Christopher E. Cotter
Represented By: Gregory H. Melick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?