Muriana v. Worthington Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alessandro Muriana
Defendant: Worthington Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00600
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: David A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Alessandro Muriana. Worthington Industries, Inc. waiver sent on 4/25/2022, answer due 6/24/2022 filed on behalf of Alessandro Muriana (Sobel, Sean)
April 14, 2022 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Worthington Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (H,Ch) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2022: #2 corrected summons) (H,Ch).
April 14, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (H,Ch)
April 14, 2022 Judge David A. Ruiz assigned to case. (H,Ch)
April 13, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Worthington Industries, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11371105.. Filed by Alessandro Muriana. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Sobel, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muriana v. Worthington Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alessandro Muriana
Represented By: Sean H. Sobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worthington Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?