Phillips v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michael R. Phillips
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2022cv00602
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Referring Judge: Jonathan D Greenberg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2022 Filing 7 Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg for further proceedings. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 6/8/2022. (P,K)
June 8, 2022 Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg assigned to case pursuant to consent. Judge Pamela A. Barker terminated. Related document(s) #7 . (H,Ch)
June 7, 2022 Filing 6 Transcript of Proceedings before the Social Security Administration filed by Commissioner of Social Security. Related document(s) #1 . (Johnson, Lisa)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 4/14/22. (D,Ky)
April 14, 2022 Filing 4 Certificate Confirming Notification of Case Information filed by Michael R. Phillips. (Ressler, Jon)
April 14, 2022 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (M,KS)
April 14, 2022 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Phillips. Related document(s) #1 . (Ressler, Jon)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Michael R. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ressler, Jon)
April 14, 2022 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 04/14/2022. (M,KS)
April 14, 2022 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (M,KS)
April 14, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (M,KS)
April 14, 2022 Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (M,KS)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 4/14/22.(D,Ky)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Phillips
Represented By: Jon H. Ressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?