Bishop v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Aja Bishop
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2022cv00605
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Filing 7 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by FedEx executed upon United States of America, CTS, Northern Region, Tax Division, Department of Justice on 05/24/2022 filed on behalf of Aja Bishop. Related document(s) #3 . (H,Ch)
May 31, 2022 Filing 6 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by FedEx executed upon United States of America, Internal Revenue Service on 05/25/2022 filed on behalf of Aja Bishop. Related document(s) #3 . (H,Ch)
May 31, 2022 Filing 5 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by FedEx executed upon Merrick Garland - Attorney General of the United States on 05/23/2022 filed on behalf of Aja Bishop. Related document(s) #3 . (H,Ch)
May 31, 2022 Filing 4 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by personal executed upon United States of America, Office of the Unites States Attorney on 5/26/2022 filed on behalf of Aja Bishop. Related document(s) #3 . (H,Ch)
April 27, 2022 Filing 3 Original Summons, Complaint and Magistrate Consent Form issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon upon the Department of Justice CTS Northern Region Tax Division, the U.S. Attorney General and the U.S. Attorney, filed on behalf of Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 USM Form 285, #2 Magistrate Consent Package) (P,K)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. This Court finds that Plaintiff is unable to pay the requisite court fees under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1), and thus, Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 4/22/2022.(P,K)
April 14, 2022 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Aja Bishop. (H,Ch)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against United States of America. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Aja Bishop. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 USM-285, #4 Praecipe). (H,Ch)
April 14, 2022 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (H,Ch)
April 14, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (H,Ch)
April 14, 2022 Notice of failure to file electronically, pursuant to Local Rule 5.1(c). (H,Ch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishop v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aja Bishop
Represented By: Dennis A. Dobos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?