MMI-CPR, LLC v. Work Hard Play Hard Enterprises Limited et al
Plaintiff: MMI-CPR, LLC
Defendant: Work Hard Play Hard Enterprises Limited and Ryan Cook
Case Number: 1:2022cv00758
Filed: May 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2022 Filing 24 Returned Mail addressed to Party Work Hard Play Hard Enterprises Limited, c/o Ryan Cook at 229 Parkway Drive Fort Oglethorpe, GA 30742. Marked, "Return to Sender. Not Deliverable as Addressed. Unable to Forward." Related document(s) #18 , #19 . (M,KS)
June 27, 2022 Filing 23 Returned Mail addressed to Party Ryan Cook, Work Hard Play Hard Enterprises Limited. Marked, "Return to Sender. Attempted - Not Known. Unable to Forward." Related document(s) #18 , #19 . (M,KS)
June 21, 2022 Filing 22 Returned Mail addressed to Party Work Hard Play Hard Enterprises Limited, c/o Ryan Cook at 229 Parkway Drive Fort Oglethorpe, GA 30742. Marked, " Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed. Unable to Forward." Related document #16 . (M,KS)
June 21, 2022 Filing 21 Returned Mail addressed to Party Ryan Cook, Work Hard Play Hard Enterprises Limited at 52 McKinley Lane Ringgold, GA 30736. Marked, "Return to Sender. Attempted- Not Known. Unable to Forward." Related document #16 . (M,KS)
June 21, 2022 Filing 20 Returned Mail addressed to Party Work Hard Play Hard Enterprises Limited, c/o Ryan Cook at 1906 Gunbarrel Road, Unit 108, Chattanooga, Tennessee 37421. Marked, "Return to Sender. No Such Number. Unable to Forward." Related document #16 . (M,KS)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order of Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is hereby granted for the reasons stated on the open record as well as the reasons stated in the TRO and the court's order granting the Motion to Modify the TRO (ECF No. #18 ). Accordingly, the court hereby enters apreliminary injunction in Plaintiff's favor with the same terms and conditions set forth in the TRO (ECF No. #10 ) plus the additional conditions in the Motion to Modify the TRO (ECF No. #18 ). Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 6/15/2022. (R,Sh)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Minute Order of Telephonic Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 6/13/2022. The court held a telephonic preliminary injunction hearing on the open record with counsel for the parties in the within case on June 13, 2022. Defendant Cook did not attend the conference. After hearing from counsel for Plaintiff and reviewing the evidence in the record, the court determined that a preliminary injunction should be entered in favor of Plaintiff bearing the same terms and conditions set forth in the TRO. In addition, the court hereby grants Plaintiff's Motion to Modify the TRO (ECF No. #17 ) and will issue a separate Order including the conditions set forth in the Modified TRO in the Preliminary Injunction Order. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 6/15/2022. Time: 30 minutes (R,Sh)
June 15, 2022 Copy of #18 and #19 Minute Order of Telephonic Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Order of Preliminary Injunction mailed to Ryan Cook, Work Hard Play Hard Enterprises Limited, 52 McKinley Lane Ringgold, GA 30736; Work Hard Play Hard Enterprises Limited, c/o Ryan Cook, 229 Parkway Drive Fort Oglethorpe, GA 30742; Work Hard Play Hard Enterprises Limited, c/o Ryan Cook, 1906 Gunbarrel Road, Unit 108, Chattanooga, Tennessee 37421 6/15/2022. Related document(s) #18 . (R,Sh) Modified on 6/15/2022 (R,Sh).
June 10, 2022 Filing 17 Motion for Modification of Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff MMI-CPR, LLC. Related document(s) #16 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Landlord Correspondence)(Parker, Sarah)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order. For the reasons stated on the open record, the court finds there is good cause to extend the TRO. The TRO is extended until June 14, 2022. A Preliminary Injunction Hearing is set for 6/13/2022 at 02:00 PM to be held telephonically before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. Dial-in information will be issued separately. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 6/3/2022. (R,Sh)
June 3, 2022 Copy of #16 Order, mailed to Ryan Cook Work Hard Play Hard Enterprises Limited 52 McKinley Lane Ringgold, GA 30736, Work Hard Play Hard Enterprises Limited c/o Ryan Cook 229 Parkway Drive Fort Oglethorpe, GA 30742, and Work Hard Play Hard Enterprises Limited c/o Ryan Cook 1906 Gunbarrel Road, Unit 108Chattanooga, Tennessee 37421 on 6/3/2022. Related document(s) #16 . (R,Sh)
May 31, 2022 Filing 15 Supplement to Motion for temporary restraining order - Supplemental Declaration of Porscha Imperial, filed by MMI-CPR, LLC. Related document(s) #4 . (Rosenberg, Jason)
May 31, 2022 Filing 14 Supplement to Motion for temporary restraining order - Affidavit of Diligence regarding Service of Process, filed by MMI-CPR, LLC. Related document(s) #4 . (Rosenberg, Jason)
May 31, 2022 Filing 13 Supplement to Motion for temporary restraining order - Second Supplemental Decl. of Sarah Parker, filed by MMI-CPR, LLC. Related document(s) #4 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Text Correspondence Providing Notice to Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - Email Correspondence Providing Notice to Defendants)(Rosenberg, Jason)
May 19, 2022 Filing 12 Supplement to Motion for temporary restraining order - Affidavit of Diligence Regarding Attempted Service, filed by MMI-CPR, LLC. Related document(s) #4 . (Friedman, Joshua)
May 19, 2022 Filing 11 Supplement to Motion for temporary restraining order - Supplemental Declaration of Sarah Parker Regarding Attempted Service, filed by MMI-CPR, LLC. Related document(s) #4 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Text Messages to Cook re Service, #2 Exhibit B - Emails to Cook re Service)(Friedman, Joshua)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Sarah H. Parker, and Jason D. Rosenberg for MMI-CPR, LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #6 , #7 ). Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 5/17/2022.(R,Sh)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order regarding Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Defendants are hereby enjoined and restrained as detailed in this Oder. CPR shall post a bond in the amount of $5,000 with the Clerk of Court within ten (10) business days of this Order. Plaintiff shall notify the court in writing if they have reason to believe that Defendants have not complied with this Order within ten (10) business days of this Order. If Defendants fail to comply with this Order, the court will hold a hearing to determine further remedies to enforce this Order. The court hereby sets a Preliminary Injunction hearing with counsel for the parties in the within case on June 1, 2022, at 11:45 a.m. to be held telephonically. Dial-in information will be sent separately. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 5/16/2022. (M,CE)
May 16, 2022 Filing 9 Supplement to Motion for temporary restraining order - Declaration of Sarah Parker Regarding Notice and Further Attempted Service, filed by MMI-CPR, LLC. Related document(s) #4 . (Friedman, Joshua)
May 16, 2022 Filing 8 Supplement to Motion for temporary restraining order - Affidavit of diligence of service, filed by MMI-CPR, LLC. Related document(s) #4 . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of diligence of service)(Friedman, Joshua)
May 13, 2022 Hearing regarding Plaintiff's pending #4 Motion for temporary restraining order set for 5/16/2022 at 11:00 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. Dial-in information will be sent separately. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 5/13/2022. (M,CE)
May 11, 2022 Filing 7 Motion for attorney Jason D. Rosenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11415846, filed by Plaintiff MMI-CPR, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jason D. Rosenberg)(Friedman, Joshua)
May 11, 2022 Filing 6 Motion for attorney Sarah H. Parker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11415819, filed by Plaintiff MMI-CPR, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sarah H. Parker)(Friedman, Joshua)
May 11, 2022 Filing 5 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Ryan Cook, and Work Hard Play Hard Enterprises Limited at Chattanooga, Tennessee address and Fort Oglethorpe, Georgia address. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,KS)
May 11, 2022 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (M,KS)
May 11, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (M,KS)
May 10, 2022 Filing 4 Motion for temporary restraining order filed by Plaintiff MMI-CPR, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Imperial Declaration, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fisher, John)
May 10, 2022 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by MMI-CPR, LLC. (Fisher, John)
May 10, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Assurant, Inc. for MMI-CPR, LLC filed by MMI-CPR, LLC. (Fisher, John)
May 10, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Ryan Cook, Work Hard Play Hard Enterprises Limited. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11414691.. Filed by MMI-CPR, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Admin. Dissolution, #2 Exhibit B - 2019 WHPH Annual Registration, #3 Exhibit C - CPR Registrations, #4 Exhibit D - Franchise Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Default, #6 Exhibit F - Notice of Termination, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons for Work Hard Play Hard (Chattanooga), #9 Summons for Work Hard Play Hard (Georgia), #10 Summons for Ryan Cook) (Fisher, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MMI-CPR, LLC v. Work Hard Play Hard Enterprises Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MMI-CPR, LLC
Represented By: John F. Fisher
Represented By: Jason D. Rosenberg
Represented By: Joshua A. Friedman
Represented By: Raymond Rundelli
Represented By: Sarah H. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Work Hard Play Hard Enterprises Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?