Noco Company v. Jasper Industrial Supply, Inc.
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Defendant: Jasper Industrial Supply, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00851
Filed: May 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Bridget Meehan Brennan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order to Show Cause: Plaintiff is instructed to submit an appropriate motion, affidavit, request for entry of default, and proposed order for default judgment by July 29, 2022, or show cause why said defendant should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 7/15/2022. (V,AR)
June 15, 2022 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Hannah J. Kraus filed by on behalf of Noco Company. (Kraus, Hannah)
June 7, 2022 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Jasper Industrial Supply, Inc. on 6/2/2022, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Noco Company. Related document(s) #3 . (L,Br)
June 1, 2022 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Noco Company. (Bullock, Anna)
June 1, 2022 Notice of Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Local Rule 3.13(c) requires the filing of the #AO121 Copyright Report Form or #AO120 Patent and Trademark Report Form by 6/8/2022. (W,Na)
May 24, 2022 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Jasper Industrial Supply, Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7020 2450 0001 5492 3703. (H,Ch)
May 23, 2022 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Jasper Industrial Supply, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (L,MI)
May 23, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noco Company. (Pinney, Jon)
May 23, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Jasper Industrial Supply, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11433655.. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant's storefront on www.Walmart.com, #3 Exhibit 3 - December 7, 2021 Cease & Desist Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Pinney, Jon)
May 23, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,MI)
May 23, 2022 Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan assigned to case. (L,MI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noco Company v. Jasper Industrial Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Represented By: Alexander M. Welsh
Represented By: Anna Elaine Bullock
Represented By: Derek P. Hartman
Represented By: Jon J. Pinney
Represented By: Hannah J. Kraus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasper Industrial Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?