Kubas v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kathryn Kubas
Defendant: Commisioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2022cv00856
Filed: May 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Bridget Meehan Brennan
Referring Judge: Carmen E Henderson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time until August 8, 2022 to answer. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 7/21/2022.(S,KL)
July 20, 2022 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until August 8, 2022 to answer filed by Defendant Commisioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Staley Rafferty, Cara)
June 13, 2022 Filing 6 Consent to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson for further proceedings. Related Document(s) #5 . Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 6/13/2022. (R,AP)
June 13, 2022 Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson assigned to case pursuant to consent. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan terminated. Related document(s) #6 . (L,MI)
June 10, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Commisioner of Social Security Administration. (Staley Rafferty, Cara)
May 24, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,KL)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant's Answer, the transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1, including but not limited to the schedule set forth in that Rule. Any requests for an extension of time shall be filed at least five days prior to the due date for filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 5/24/2022. (S,KL)
May 24, 2022 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (H,Ch)
May 24, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11435029. Filed by Kathryn Kubas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Margolius, Marcia)
May 24, 2022 Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan assigned to case. (H,Ch)
May 24, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (H,Ch)
May 24, 2022 Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (H,Ch)
May 24, 2022 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 05/24/2022. (H,Ch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kubas v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Kubas
Represented By: Marcia W. Margolius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commisioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Cara Staley Rafferty
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?