Frierson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Theodore Marcus Frierson, III
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2022cv00899
Filed: May 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Referring Judge: Carmen E Henderson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time until August 15, 2022 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 7/28/2022.(S,KL)
July 27, 2022 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until August 15, 2022 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Lisa)
June 2, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (G,M)
June 2, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant's Answer, the transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1, including but not limited to the schedule set forth in that Rule. Any requests for an extension of time shall be filed at least five days prior to the due date for filing. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 6/2/2022. (G,M)
May 31, 2022 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI)
May 31, 2022 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (L,MI)
May 31, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (L,MI)
May 31, 2022 Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (L,MI)
May 31, 2022 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 5/31/2022. (L,MI)
May 30, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11443976. Filed by Theodore Marcus Frierson, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shifrin, Debra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frierson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Marcus Frierson, III
Represented By: Debra S. Shifrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Cara Staley Rafferty
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?