Ligon v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Antoinette Ligon
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2022cv00939
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Referring Judge: Carmen E Henderson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Counsel for the parties are hereby ORDERED to meet and confer. The conference must be done by in-person meeting or by telephonic or video conference no later than the deadline for filing defendant's brief. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 7/28/2022. (S,KL)
July 27, 2022 Filing 7 Transcript of Proceedings before the Social Security Administration filed by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. Related document(s) #1 . (Johnson, Lisa)
June 6, 2022 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,KL)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant's Answer, the transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1, including but not limited to the schedule set forth in that Rule. Any requests for an extension of time shall be filed at least five days prior to the due date for filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 6/6/2022. (S,KL)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting plaintiff's #3 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 6/6/2022.(S,KL)
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Antoinette Ligon. (Gillissie, Rebecca)
June 3, 2022 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (S,HR)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Antoinette Ligon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gillissie, Rebecca)
June 3, 2022 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 6/3/22. (S,HR)
June 3, 2022 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (S,HR)
June 3, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (S,HR)
June 3, 2022 Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (S,HR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ligon v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Ligon
Represented By: Rebecca R. Gillissie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?