Mitchell v. Menorah Park Center for Senior Living Bet Moshav Zekenim Hadati
Plaintiff: Sharon Mitchell
Defendant: Menorah Park Center for Senior Living Bet Moshav Zekenim Hadati
Case Number: 1:2022cv01488
Filed: August 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: David A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2661 Family Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2022 Filing 3 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Menorah Park Center for Senior Living Bet Moshav Zekenim Hadati on 9/26/2022, filed on behalf of Sharon Mitchell (Related document(s) #1 , #2 ) (Hux, James)
September 14, 2022 Reassignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2022-16. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes, Jr. (L,MI)
August 22, 2022 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Menorah Park Center for Senior Living Bet Moshav Zekenim Hadati. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (L,MI)
August 22, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,MI)
August 22, 2022 Judge David A. Ruiz assigned to case. (L,MI)
August 21, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint for damages and injunctive relief with jury demand against Menorah Park Center for Senior Living Bet Moshav Zekenim Hadati. Filing fee paid $402.00. Receipt number AOHNDC-11577203. Filed by Sharon Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons). (Hux, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Menorah Park Center for Senior Living Bet Moshav Zekenim Hadati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Mitchell
Represented By: James J.B. Hux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menorah Park Center for Senior Living Bet Moshav Zekenim Hadati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?