Caldwell v. Giunta et al
Plaintiff: Frances Caldwell
Defendant: Anthony Giunta, Michael Chambers, Judge Brian J. Corrigan, State of Ohio and David Yost
Case Number: 1:2022cv01829
Filed: October 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: J Philip Calabrese
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order to block Federal funding to the State of Ohio pursuant to the spending clause, Article I, Section 8 Clause 1 of the United States Constitution for deprivation of civil rights against state citizens filed by Frances Caldwell. (Mc,K)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Amended complaint against Michael Chambers, Brian J. Corrigan, Anthony Giunta, State of Ohio, and adding new party defendant(s) David Yost, Attorney General. Filed by Frances Caldwell. (F,AW)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of #2 Magistrate Consent Form Issued mailed to Frances Caldwell at 10618 Drexel Ave Cleveland, OH 44108 on 10/12/22. (F,AW)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (F,AW)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint for conspiracy to commit real estate deed fraud violation, deprivation of rights under color of law conspiracy against rights, and violation of the IRS code, with jury demand against Michael Chambers, Brian J. Corrigan, Anthony Giunta, State of Ohio. Filing fee paid. $402.00. Receipt # 14660141378. Filed by Frances Caldwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (F,AW)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (F,AW)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. (F,AW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell v. Giunta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Giunta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Brian J. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?