Groskopf v. Steris Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Brianna Groskopf
Defendant: Steris Corporation and Adam Smith
Case Number: 1:2022cv02000
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: J Philip Calabrese
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2022 Filing 7 Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. A status conference was conducted on November 29, 2022. The parties were able to reach an agreement. The parties shall file a notice of dismissal with prejudice by close of business (5:00 p.m.) on December 28, 2022. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement. Time: 30 minutes. (D,Ky)
November 28, 2022 Filing 6 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Brianna Groskopf. (Buryanek, Kevin)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Telephonic case management conference to be held on 11/29/2022 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. Call-in information will be emailed to counsel prior to the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 11/15/22. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Report of Parties Planning Meeting, #2 Attachment 2 - Local Rule 30.1) (D,Ky)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Rule 72(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 72.1, the Magistrate Judge may hear and decide all pretrial matters not dispositive of any party's claim or defense and, when appropriate, issue a written order stating the decision. The Court therefore REFERS this matter to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Greenberg to handle all pretrial matters, except the Magistrate Judge need not prepare a report and recommendation on any dispositive motions. The parties will receive further instructions from Judge Greenberg's Chambers. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 11/14/2022. (Y,A)
November 11, 2022 Filing 4 Answer to Removal filed by Adam Smith, Steris Corporation. Related document #1 (Tersigni, Vincent)
November 4, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
November 4, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Defendants. (Tersigni, Vincent)
November 4, 2022 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Lake County Court of Common Pleas, case number 22 CV 001304 Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-11699010. Filed by Adam Smith, Steris Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lake County Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tersigni, Vincent)
November 4, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI)
November 4, 2022 Judge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (L,MI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Groskopf v. Steris Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna Groskopf
Represented By: Daniel S. Dubow
Represented By: Kevin A. Buryanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steris Corporation
Represented By: Lyndsay M. Ross
Represented By: Vincent J. Tersigni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Smith
Represented By: Lyndsay M. Ross
Represented By: Vincent J. Tersigni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?